Aguilar v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Nicolas A. Aguilar
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00211
Filed: January 16, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
May 16, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINE filed by Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
March 30, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Nicolas A. Aguilar filed by Nicolas A. Aguilar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas A. Aguilar
Represented By: Andrei Armas
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Matthew Michael Loker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Connie Tcheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Elisabeth Carlton Robinson
Represented By: David James Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?