Securities And Exchange Commission v. San Francisco Regional Center LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Defendant: San Francisco Regional Center LLC, Thomas M. Henderson, California Gold Medal, L.P., CallSocket, L.P., CallSocket II, L.P., CallSocket III, L.P., Comprehensive Care of Oakland, L.P., NA3PL, L.P., West Oakland Plaza, L.P., CallSocket, LLC, CallSocket II, LLC, CallSocket III, LLC, Comprehensive Care of California, LLC, Immedia LLC, North America 3PL, LLC, CallSocket Holding Company, LLC, CallSocket III Holding Company, LLC, Berkeley Healthcare Dynamics, LLC, Central California Farms, LLC and JL Gateway, LLC
Receiver: Susan L. Uecker
Case Number: 3:2017cv00223
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER DENYING 807 MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 814 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE WITHDRAWAL OF RECEIVER'S SECOND MOTION FOR ORDER ALLOWING AND DISALLOWING NON EB5-INVESTMENT CLAIM IN PART. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/22/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER by Judge Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 663 Ex Parte Application. (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 660 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 633 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 632 Entry of Judgment of Disgorgement as to Relief Defendant Berkeley Healthcare Dynamics, LLC; and (2) Termination of Receivership as to Relief Defenda filed by Susan L. Uecker. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/27/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 575 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 572 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 561 MOTION for an Order with Respect to the Receiver's Motion for Order Consolidating the Receivership Entities for Purposes of Distribution re 100 Order, Terminate Motions filed by EB-5 Investors in CallSocket, LO.P. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/15/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 495 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 501 extension of briefing schedule; denying intervenors' request for leave to file cross-motion. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting 290 Motion re Repurchase of Interest in Comprehensive Care of California, LLC. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 156 Motion to Shorten Time. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 154 Granting Receiver's Administrative Motion for Order Authorizing Receiver to Commence Litigation Against Third Parties. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 101 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Appoint Receiver. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 65 to Exceed Page Limit for its Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Appointment of Receiver. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/17. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER 35 to Extend the Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/31/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities And Exchange Commission v. San Francisco Regional Center LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Regional Center LLC
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Henderson
Represented By: Gilbert Ross Serota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Gold Medal, L.P.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallSocket, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallSocket II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallSocket III, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Care of Oakland, L.P.
Represented By: Sumy Kim
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NA3PL, L.P.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Oakland Plaza, L.P.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallSocket, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallSocket II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallSocket III, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Care of California, LLC
Represented By: Sumy Kim
Represented By: Yosef Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immedia LLC
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North America 3PL, LLC
Represented By: James J. Ficenec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallSocket Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CallSocket III Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Healthcare Dynamics, LLC
Represented By: James J. Ficenec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central California Farms, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JL Gateway, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Represented By: Steven Dennis Buchholz
Represented By: Jina L. Choi
Represented By: Thomas J. Eme
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Hefty
Represented By: Susan F. LaMarca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Susan L. Uecker
Represented By: Elizabeth Berke-Dreyfuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?