Figueroa Zarceno v. City and County of San Francisco et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Pedro Figueroa Zarceno filed a civil rights lawsuit against Defendants the City and County of San Francisco, the San Francisco Police Department and the San Francisco Sheriff's Department. Plaintiff alleged that he was unlawfully arrested, detained and turned over to Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE) when he went to retrieve his stolen car from the San Francisco Police Department in violation of the federal and state constitution as well as the local sanctuary city ordinance.

Plaintiff: Pedro Figueroa Zarceno
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Toney Chaplin, Vicki Hennessey, Eric Balmy, Nicole Chambers, Kevin Clifford, Trevor Kelly and Dayna Thibeaux
Case Number: 3:2017cv00229
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2017 6 Proposed Summons. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
January 18, 2017 5 Proposed Summons. (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 18, 2017 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/1/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 17, 2017 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2017. Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2017 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 17, 2017 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pedro Figueroa Zarceno (Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 17, 2017 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11079785.). Filed byPedro Figueroa Zarceno. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, Belinda) (Filed on 1/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa Zarceno v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Figueroa Zarceno
Represented By: Angela Fuhn Chan
Represented By: Saira A Hussain
Represented By: Winifred Virginia Kao
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Nicholas Yuanming Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Newton Oldfather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toney Chaplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Hennessey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Balmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dayna Thibeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?