JGX, Inc. et al v. Handlery et al
Plaintiff: JGX, Inc., Nick Bovis, Bovis Foods, LLC and SMTM Technology, LLC
Defendant: John Handlery, Handlery Hotels, Inc., Sam Singer and Singer Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00287
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE Re: Dkt. No. 88 Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/31/19. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING 66 MOTION TO ALLOW TIME FOR DISCOVERY UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56(D); AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motion for Summary Judgment Opposition due August 1, 2019. Reply due August 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/9/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING IN PART WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING IN PART 42 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE FAC; DENYING 41 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/20/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 18 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JGX, Inc. et al v. Handlery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JGX, Inc.
Represented By: Jose Camilo Artiga-Purcell
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Bovis
Represented By: Jose Camilo Artiga-Purcell
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bovis Foods, LLC
Represented By: Jose Camilo Artiga-Purcell
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMTM Technology, LLC
Represented By: Jose Camilo Artiga-Purcell
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Handlery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handlery Hotels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singer Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?