Travelers Indemnity Company et al v. Premier Organics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, American Economy Insurance Company, First National Insurance Company of America and Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Premier Organics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00302
Filed: January 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 Stipulation, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Premier Organics, Inc., ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. [The Friday, 1/26/2018 at 2:00 PM Compliance hearing is VACATED.] Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/19/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ALLOW TIME FOR DISCOVERY; CONTINUING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying without prejudice to refiling once limited discovery is conducted 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 57 Motion to Continue all Briefing and hearing on plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 10/20/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/3/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 25 Stipulation; Vacating Deadlines and Hearing; Setting Compliance Hearing. Compliance hearing is set for Friday 5/26/2017 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing by 5/19/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Indemnity Company et al v. Premier Organics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Represented By: Alexander Eugene Potente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Represented By: Alexander Eugene Potente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Economy Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelley Kurtis Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kelley Kurtis Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Eagle Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kelley Kurtis Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Organics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?