Cilluffo v. Vega
Petitioner: Thomas Joseph Cilluffo
Respondent: Oscar Vega
Case Number: 3:2017cv00310
Filed: January 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE HABEAS PETITION; DENIAL OF CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/27/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 6/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 4/27/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 4/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/14/2017. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cilluffo v. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Joseph Cilluffo
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Kross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Oscar Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?