Harris et al v. Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Plaintiff: Starvonna Harris and Jonathan Strickland
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00446
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 177 Stipulated for Dismissal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFF HARRISS UNOPPOSED 174 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 157 Stipulation to Move Trial and Pretrial Conference Dates. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 141 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 143 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 85 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, GRANTING DEFENDANTS 118 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS AND REQUEST TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS ( 94 , 95 ) MOTIONS FOR RELIEF FROM ORDERS OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE.Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2018 and Further Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 124 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 91 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF JONATHAN STRICKLAND'S CLAIMS AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S 58 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF STARVONA HARRIS'S PAGA CAUSE OF ACTION BASED ON OVERTIME WAGES.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS' 67 MOTION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO PRODUCE AN EXPERT REPORT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding parties' 80 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Harris's First Set of Document Requests. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 75 Stipulation Relating to Class Certification Motion. Motions due by 10/26/2017; Responses due by 11/16/2017; Replies due by 11/30/2017; Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 60 , 61 Joint Discovery Letter Briefs re: Strickland. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 62 7/28/17 Discovery Letter Brief re: Plaintiff Starvona Harris's Deposition. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 46 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTPlaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document. Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 34 Motion for Protective Order. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Bryan Jarrett
Represented By: Barbara Jean Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starvonna Harris
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Strickland
Represented By: Kevin Francis Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?