Mitzie Perez et al v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Mitzie Perez and California League of United Latin American Citizens
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co. and Wells Fargo, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00454
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. Plaintiffs are directed to file their Fifth Amended Complaint in the public record and to do so no later than July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 12, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING DEFERRED PORTION OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF. Wells Fargo need not provide discovery as to its mortgage loan and automobile loan practices. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 15, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF; STAYING CLASS DISCOVERY IN PART. To the extent the Motion for Relief challenges the order allowing class discovery on personal loans, the motion is denie d. To the extent the Motion for Relief challenges the order allowing class discovery on automobile loans and mortgages, the Court defers ruling thereon until after plaintiffs have filed any Fourth Amended Complaint and the Court has resolved any moti on to strike the class allegations included therein. Class discovery on automobile loans and mortgages remains stayed pending resolution of the deferred portion of the Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND; DEFERRING RULING ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DISCOVERY ORDERS; GRANTING MOTION TO STAY RELATED DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR RELIEF; VACATING HEARING . Plaintiffs' class allegations are stricken, and plaintiffs are afforded leave to amend for purposes of redefining the proposed class. Any Third Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 30, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/15/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Miazad, Ossai. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitzie Perez et al v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitzie Perez
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Adam T. Klein
Represented By: Michael N Litrownik
Represented By: Patrick David Lopez
Represented By: Ossai Miazad
Represented By: Olivia J Quinto
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Saenz
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Represented By: Victor Viramontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California League of United Latin American Citizens
Represented By: Katrina Leigh Eiland
Represented By: Adam T. Klein
Represented By: Michael N Litrownik
Represented By: Patrick David Lopez
Represented By: Ossai Miazad
Represented By: Olivia J Quinto
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Saenz
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Represented By: Victor Viramontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: Mary J. Hackett
Represented By: Marc Albert Lackner
Represented By: Matthew David Monsour
Represented By: K. Issac deVyver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: Mary J. Hackett
Represented By: Marc Albert Lackner
Represented By: Matthew David Monsour
Represented By: K. Issac deVyver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?