Johnson v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sherida Johnson
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00517
Filed: February 1, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Riverside
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2018 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William H. Orrick. Counts 10, 12, 14, 15, and 16 are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend Counts 10 and 15 only within 20 days. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
January 22, 2018 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue hearing as to 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing reset for 2/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/22/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
December 20, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 STIPULATION To Reschedule Argument on 59 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 1/31/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/20/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
June 1, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 STIPULATION to continue Case Management and deadlines as to 35 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 6/27/2017. Reply due by 7/24/2017. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Case Management Statement due 08/02/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/01/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
April 14, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO granting 33 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/14/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017) Modified on 4/14/2017 to correct CMC dates (jmdS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Amir M. Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherida Johnson
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Adam A Edwards
Represented By: Crystal Gayle Foley
Represented By: Paul J. Hanly, Jr.
Represented By: Mark E Silvey
Represented By: Lisa A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?