County of Santa Clara v. Donald J. Trump et al
Plaintiff: County of Santa Clara
Defendant: Donald J. Trump, Dana J. Boente, Mark Sandy, John F. Kelly, Elaine C. Duke, Attorney General Jefferson B. Sessions, Kirstjen Nielsen, Director, OMB Mick Mulvaney, Kevin K. McAleenan and William P. Barr
Amicus Curiae: LifeMoves, City of Salinas, Administrative Law Professors, Second Harvest Food Bank of Santa Clara and San Mateo Counties, Professors of Constitutional Law, Administrative Law, and Immigration Law, The Superintendent of Public Instruction, Appboy Inc., Ampush Media, Inc., Anti-Defamation League, Homeless Emergency Service Providers Association, Political Science Scholars, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles, State of California, Asian Americans for Community Involvement, Worker Justice Center of New York, Inc, Public Schools, Public School Districts, and Associations of Educators, Silicon Valley Council of Nonprofits, Abode Services, Constitutional Law Scholars, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, Silicon Valley De-Bug, SugarCRM Inc., City of Oakland, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, City of New Orleans, Northwest Forest Worker Center, We Belong Together, Eventbrite, 48 Cities and Counties, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, City of Fremont, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, National Immigration Law Center, Florida Immigrant Coaltion, Inc, Fresh Lifelines for Youth, City of Berkeley, Workers Defense Project, Latin American Legal Defense and Education Fund, City of Menlo Park, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Florida Legal Services, Inc, Work & Co, San Jose/Silicon Valley NAACP, California Association of Nonprofits, Services, Immigrants' Rights, and Education Network, IDEO, Greater Rochester Coalition for Immigration Justice, Azavea, San Francisco Human Services Network, City of Santa Rosa, San Francisco Latino Parity and Equity Coalition, The Health Trust, California Community Colleges, Catholic Charities of Santa Clara County, Tahirih Justice Center, et al., Asian Law Alliance, Equal Rights Advocates, Community Solutions, General Assembly, County of Marin, West Valley Community Services, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - AAJC, County of Alameda, City of Davis, Checkr, Inc., Unite Here Local 19, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Destination: Home, Southern Poverty Law Center, National Employment Law Project, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, API Council of San Francisco, Knotel, St. Louis Workers Education Society, Working Partnerships USA, San Francisco Mental Health Contractors Association, Worksafe, Justice in Motion, City Of San Jose, Minted LLC, Chegg Inc., Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, City of Richmond, States of West Virginia, Louisiana, et al., Individual Sheriffs and Police Chiefs, Yu-Ai Kai Japanese American Community Senior Service, HealthRIGHT 360, Adelante Alabama Worker Center, New Orleans Workers' Center for Racial Justice, National Center for Lesbian Rights, Service Employees International Union, City of Mountain View, Alabama Coalition for Immigrant Justice, Mapbox, Pangea Legal Services, Jobs With Justice, City of Santa Cruz, Silicon Valley Independent Living Center of Santa Clara, Inc., Americans for Immigrant Justice, Coalition of Agencies Serving the Elderly, Safe Horizon, Tennessee Immigrant and Refugee Rights Coalition, Southeast Immigrant Rights Network, Marin Software, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, Caminar, City of East Palo Alto, HIV/AIDS Provider Network, American Federation of Teachers, Managed by Q Inc. and County of Monterey
Intervenor Plaintiff: Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley
Intervenor Defendant: Kuang-Bao P. Ou-Young
Case Number: 3:2017cv00574
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
2 Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting #205 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 205 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Final Judgment filed by County of Santa Clara. (Serrano, Lawrence) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re (232 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) Continuing Case Management Conference and related deadlines. Case Management Statement or proposed judgment due by 8/13/2019. Case Management Conference continued to 8/20/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Wi on 08/02/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 203 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint Statement on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendants) filed by William P. Barr, Dana J. Boente, Elaine C. Duke, John F. Kelly, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mick Mulvaney, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 202 NOTICE by Ampush Media, Inc., Appboy Inc., Azavea, Checkr, Inc., Chegg Inc., Eventbrite, General Assembly, IDEO, Knotel, Managed by Q Inc., Mapbox, Marin Software, Minted LLC, SugarCRM Inc., Work & Co Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Fritz, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference continued to 8/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/17/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 200 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint Statement, Stipulation, and Proposed Order, on behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendants) filed by William P. Barr, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mick Mulvaney, Donald J. Trump. (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 10, 2019 Reset Hearing - Case Management Conference date corrected to 5/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Danielle Luce Goldstein (Goldstein, Danielle) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 198 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Daniel D. Mauler and withdrawal of W. Scott Simpson as counsel for Defendants (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Order Regarding Scheduling of Case Management Conference by Judge William H. Orrick granting #196 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 to correct CMC date. (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2019 Filing 196 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #195 Stipulation and Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Terminate Motions,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Regarding Scheduling of Case Management Conference filed by Mick Mulvaney, Donald J. Trump, Kevin K. McAleenan, William P. Barr. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Motions terminated: (194 in 3:17-cv-00574-WHO) STIPULATION and (223 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/21/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 194 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by County of Santa Clara. (Goldstein, Danielle) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #192 Stipulation. Case Management Conference continued to 3/26/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Scheduling of Case Management Conference filed by County of Santa Clara. (Goldstein, Danielle) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/3/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 190 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Danielle Luce Goldstein (Goldstein, Danielle) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2018. Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/8/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 188 MANDATE of USCA The judgment of this Court, entered August 01,2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court. FOR THE COURT; as to #184 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, Mick Mulvaney, Kirstjen Nielsen, Donald J. Trump, #165 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, Elaine C. Duke, Mick Mulvaney, Donald J. Trump Re USCA Number 17-17480 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 187 USCA Opinion; as to #165 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, Elaine C. Duke, Mick Mulvaney, Donald J. Trump (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
February 28, 2018 Filing 186 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #185 USCA Mandate (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 28, 2018 Filing 185 MANDATE of USCA The judgment of this Court, entered January 04,2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court. FOR THE COURT; as to #165 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, Elaine C. Duke, Mick Mulvaney, Donald J. Trump (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
December 14, 2017 Filing 184 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals; filed by Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump, Kirstjen Nielsen. Appeal of #182 Order & Judgment, Terminated Case #183 ; (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 12/14/2017) Modified on 12/15/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2017 Filing 183 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/22/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #151 Motion for Summary Judgment. The defendants are permanently enjoined from enforcing Section 9(a) of the Executive Order against jurisdictions they deem as sanctuary jurisdictions. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 181 Request for Judicial Notice re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF THE COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 180 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/23/17, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter Pamela A. Batalo, telephone number pamela_batalo@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (189 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2018. (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 23, 2017 Filing 179 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 10/23/2017 re Motions for Summary Judgment. Argument of counsel heard. Written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 49 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/23/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE of Change of Address by Nathan M McClellan , Fred Magaziner, and Christopher S Burrichter (McClellan, Nathan) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT - Reset Hearing as to (158 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) MOTION for Summary Judgment and (151 in 3:17-cv-00574-WHO) MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/11/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 11, 2017 Filing 176 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #164 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, filed by Elaine C. Duke, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 175 MOTION for Leave to File AMICI CURIAE BRIEF OF ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Administrative Law Professors. (Attachments: #1 AMICI CURIAE BRIEF OF ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Leary, Ann) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 174 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae In Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by County of Santa Clara. Responses due by 10/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 173 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by California Community Colleges. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/18/2017. Replies due by 10/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Johansen, Robin) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 172 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief of National Center for Lesbian Rights, et al. filed by National Center for Lesbian Rights. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2017 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/18/2017. Replies due by 10/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whelan, Amy) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 171 Request for Judicial Notice re #170 Reply to Opposition/Response Re Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #170 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 170 REPLY (re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Keker, John) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 2, 2017 Filing 169 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Political Science Scholars. Responses due by 10/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed Amicus Brief), #2 Proposed Order)(Shih, Daniel) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 27, 2017 Filing 168 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byElaine C. Duke, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Mem. from Atty Gen. for All Dept Grant-Making Components (May 22, 2017), #2 Brief for Amici Curiae, United States v. Texas, 136 S. Ct. 2271 (2016) (No. 15-674), 2016 WL 891345)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 9/27/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 167 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Maureen P. Alger (Alger, Maureen) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 166 USCA Case Number 17-16887 for #165 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jefferson B. Sessions, Elaine C. Duke, Mick Mulvaney, Donald J. Trump. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Elaine C. Duke, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,, Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #98 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, #145 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 9/18/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2017: #1 USCA NUMBER 17-16887) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME re (Dkt. 164 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO and Dkt. 162 in 3:17-cv-00574-WHO). Deadlines and hearings continued as to (158) MOTION for Summary Judgment and (151) MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/27/2017. Replies due by 10/4/2017. Motion Hearing reset for 10/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. If defendants do not wish to delay their stay request, they should file their opposition as scheduled and the current dates for the reply (September 20) and hearing (October 4) will remain. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/11/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 163 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #162 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danielle L. Goldstein In Support of Opposition)(Keker, John) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 7, 2017 Filing 162 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump, Elaine C. Duke. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Scott Simpson)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 161 Request for Judicial Notice re #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 160 Declaration of MIGUEL MARQUEZ in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 159 Declaration of SARA CODY, M.D. in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 158 Declaration of ROBERT MENICOCCI in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 157 Declaration of PAUL LORENZ in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 156 Declaration of LAURIE SMITH in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 155 Declaration of JEFFREY SMITH in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 154 Declaration of DANA REED in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 153 Declaration of CARL NEUSEL in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 152 Declaration of JEFFREY ROSEN in Support of #151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #151 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 151 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by County of Santa Clara. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/13/2017. Replies due by 9/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 3:17cv4701 will be reassigned and related. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/25/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 23, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lori Stark for Amici Curiae SIREN, et al. (Stark, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 16, 2017 Filing 148 ANSWER to #1 Complaint ; by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Department of Homeland Security, Immigration Detainer - Notice Of Action, DHS Form I-247A (3/17), #2 Office of Justice Programs Guidance Regarding Compliance with 8 U.S.C. 1373, #3 Office of Justice Programs, Additional Guidance Regarding Compliance with 8 U.S.C. 1373)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 8/16/2017) Modified on 8/17/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE TO ANSWER by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #147 Stipulation in case 3:17-cv-00485-WHO. Associated Cases: 3:17-cv-00485-WHO, 3:17-cv-00574-WHO. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #145 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER DENYING THE GOVERNMENT'S MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION AND TO DISMISS WITH REGARDS TO THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AND THE COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA by Judge William H. Orrick denying (107) Motion for Reconsideration and (111) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:17-cv-00485-WHO and denying (113) Motion for Reconsideration and (115) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:17-cv-00574-WHO. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 144 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/12/17, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (38 in 3:17-cv-01535-WHO) Transcript Order, (141 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) Transcript Order, (141 in 3:17-cv-00574-WHO) Transcript Order, (140 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2017. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 13, 2017 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/12/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by County of Santa Clara, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 12, 2017 Filing 142 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2017 re (26 in 3:17-cv-01535-WHO) MOTION to Dismiss, (115 in 3:17-cv-00574-WHO) MOTION to Dismiss, (107 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) MOTION for Reconsideration (111 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO). Motions taken under submission; written order(s) to follow. Total Time in Court 34 minutes. Court Reporter Name Katherine Sullivan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2017)
July 12, 2017 Filing 141 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/12/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Simpson Additional Counsel for Defendants (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 139 Joinder re #138 MOTION for Leave to File A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by City of Richmond. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFF CITY OF RICHMOND'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN PLAINTIFF COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA'S (1) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SURREPLY AND (2) SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF RICHMOND'S JOINDER IN CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS)(Fineman, Nancy) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to File A SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by County of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, #2 Exhibit A TO SURREPLY, #3 Exhibit B TO SURREPLY, #4 Exhibit C TO SURREPLY, #5 Exhibit C TO SURREPLY, #6 Proposed Order)(Keker, John) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 3, 2017 Filing 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 116 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 136 REPLY (re #115 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJohn F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Public Schools, Public School Districts, and Associations of Educators. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Supplemental Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion Leave)(Teshima, Darren) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 134 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Individual Sheriffs and Police Chiefs. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Piers, Matthew) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S #119 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; filed by API Council of San Francisco, Abode Services, Asian Americans for Community Involvement, California Association of Nonprofits, Caminar, Catholic Charities of Santa Clara County, Coalition of Agencies Serving the Elderly, Community Solutions, Destination: Home, Fresh Lifelines for Youth, HIV/AIDS Provider Network, HealthRIGHT 360, Homeless Emergency Service Providers Association, LifeMoves, San Francisco Human Services Network, San Francisco Latino Parity and Equity Coalition, San Francisco Mental Health Contractors Association, San Jose/Silicon Valley NAACP, Second Harvest Food Bank of Santa Clara and San Mateo Counties, Silicon Valley Independent Living Center of Santa Clara, Inc., The Health Trust, West Valley Community Services, Yu-Ai Kai Japanese American Community Senior Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Silicon Valley Council of Nonprofits, Nonprofit Associations, and Nonprofit Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix Appendix A, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Silicon Valley Council of Nonprofits, Nonprofit Associations, and NonProfit Organizations' Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae)(Alger, Maureen) (Filed on 6/28/2017) Modified on 6/30/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2017 Filing 132 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Appboy Inc., Azavea, Checkr, Inc., Chegg Inc., General Assembly, IDEO, Knotel, Mapbox, Marin Software, Minted LLC, Work & Co. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Premo, Patrick) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 131 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by The Superintendent of Public Instruction. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Prouty, Thomas) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 130 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion By California, Connecticut, Delaware, District Of Columbia, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, New York, Oregon, And Washington For Leave To File An Amicus Curiae Brief In Support Of Plaintiffs Oppositions To Defendants Motions To Dismiss filed by State of California. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Multi-state Amicus Curiae Brief of California et al., #2 Proposed Order)(Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 129 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File as Amici Curiae in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re #115 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City Of San Jose, City of Berkeley, City of Davis, City of East Palo Alto, City of Fremont, City of Mountain View, City of Oakland, City of Richmond, City of Salinas, City of Santa Cruz, City of Santa Rosa, County of Alameda, County of Marin, County of Monterey. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ross, Linda) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 128 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief re #115 MOTION to Dismiss filed by 48 Cities and Counties. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Motion for Leave to File Statement of Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Anti-Defamation League. Responses due by 7/12/2017. Replies due by 7/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Statement, #2 Proposed Order)(Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 126 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION leave to file brief amici curiae filed by Asian Law Alliance, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, Pangea Legal Services, Services, Immigrants' Rights, and Education Network, Silicon Valley De-Bug. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Srikantiah, Jayashri) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 125 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Adelante Alabama Worker Center, Alabama Coalition for Immigrant Justice, American Federation of Teachers, Americans for Immigrant Justice, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - AAJC, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus, Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles, Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Equal Rights Advocates, Florida Immigrant Coaltion, Inc, Florida Legal Services, Inc, Greater Birmingham Ministries, Greater Rochester Coalition for Immigration Justice, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Immigrant Legal Resource Center, Jobs With Justice, Justice in Motion, Latin American Legal Defense and Education Fund, LatinoJustice PRLDEF, National Employment Law Project, National Immigration Law Center, New Orleans Workers' Center for Racial Justice, Northwest Forest Worker Center, Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services, Safe Horizon, Southeast Immigrant Rights Network, Southern Poverty Law Center, St. Louis Workers Education Society, We Belong Together, Worker Justice Center of New York, Inc, Workers Defense Project, Worksafe, National Center for Lesbian Rights, Tennessee Immigrant and Refugee Rights Coalition. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Additional Amici, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Amicus Brief)(McClellan, Nathan) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Constitutional Law Scholars, Professors of Constitutional Law, Administrative Law, and Immigration Law. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Gewertz, Nevin) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 123 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's #119 Opposition to Defendants' #115 Motion to Dismiss filed by Tahirih Justice Center, et al.. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Brief, #2 Exhibit 2: Proposed Order)(Gorelick, Jamie) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 28, 2017 Filing 122 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief Supporting Plaintiffs filed by Service Employees International Union, Working Partnerships USA. Responses due by 7/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Prestel, Claire) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER continuing reply deadline re: Motions to Dismiss. Replies due by 6/29/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/26/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #119 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 21, 2017 Filing 119 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #115 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 118 Joint MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of United States' Motion to Dismiss filed by States of West Virginia, Louisiana, et al.. Responses due by 6/30/2017. Replies due by 7/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Thomas) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 117 REPLY (re #113 MOTION for Reconsideration re #112 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, ) filed byJohn F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 116 CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing reset for 7/12/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick (to comply with #102 minute order). Re: #115 Motion to Dismiss in 3:17-cv-00574-WHO, #111 Motion to Dismiss in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO, and #26 MOTION to Dismiss in 3:17-cv-01535-WHO. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/21/2017. Replies due by 6/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Mem. from Atty Gen. for All Dept Grant-Making Components (May 22, 2017), #2 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 114 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #113 MOTION for Reconsideration re #112 Order on Motion for Leave to File,,, ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Keker, John) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
May 23, 2017 Filing 113 NOTICE OF MOTION OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT'S #98 ORDER OF APRIL 25, 2017; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, and Donald J. Trump. Motion deemed filed on 5/23/2017 per #112 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Oppositions due 6/6/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017) Modified on 5/24/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge William H. Orrick re (102) Motion for Leave to File in case 3:17-cv-00485-WHO and (108) Motion for Leave to File in case 3:17-cv-00574-WHO. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 23, 2017 Filing 111 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, for Clarification ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Keker, John) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 23, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump re #108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, for Clarification (Notice of Filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING #43 MOTION TO INTERVENE by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 108 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S #98 ORDER OF APRIL 25, 2017; filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum from the Attorney General for All Department Grant-Making Components (May 22, 2017), #2 Defendants Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, for Clarification)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 5/22/2017) Modified on 5/24/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/09/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 106 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/02/2017, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; leomank@gmail.com. FTR 1:32 p.m. - 2:02 p.m. = 30 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (103 in 3:17-cv-00574-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2017. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
May 5, 2017 Filing 105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #101 Order on Stipulation filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 104 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 2, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Moreno, Catherine) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/02/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by County of Santa Clara, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 2, 2017 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 5/2/2017. The hearing set for May 9, 2017 on the City of Richmond's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is VACATED. Close of Fact Discovery: 10/31/2017. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 1/10/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2018 02:00 PM and Bench Trial set for 4/23/2018 08:00 AM before Hon. William H. Orrick, both in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. FTR Time 1:32-2:01. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2017) Modified on 5/3/2017: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #100 Stipulation. Defendants response to the plaintiffs Complaint shall be filed no later than May 8, 2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #89 Order on Stipulation filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 99 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Santa Clara. (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING THE COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA'S AND CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S MOTIONS TO ENJOIN SECTION 9(a) OF EXECUTIVE ORDER 13768 by Judge William H. Orrick re: (21) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 3:17-cv-00485-WHO and (26) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 3:17-cv-00574-WHO. All pending administrative motions for leave to file Amicus Briefs are also GRANTED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE - The start time of the Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2017 is advanced to 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 17, 2017 Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/14/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Moreno, Catherine) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 17, 2017 Filing 95 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/14/17, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (76 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) Transcript Order, (94 in 3:17-cv-00574-WHO) Transcript Order, (78 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) Transcript Order, (77 in 3:17-cv-00485-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2017. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 94 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 14, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by County of Santa Clara, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2017 re Motions for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing conducted to the constitutionality of the Executive Order regarding sanctuary jurisdictions. A case management conference is set for April 25, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. in Case No. 3:17cv485 to discuss litigation of the Section 1373 issues, which would benefit from a more comprehensive record. Argument of counsel heard. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court 1 hour, 9 minutes. Court Reporter Name Katherine Sullivan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2017)
April 13, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Roland Petrocelli as Counsel for Plaintiff-Intervenor Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley (Petrocelli, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Simpson Additional Counsel for Defendants (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 90 Second MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Record Under Local Rule 7-3(D) filed by County of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Keker, John) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #60 Stipulation. Defendants' response to the plaintiff's complaint shall be filed no later than May 1, 2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Annasara Guzzo Purcell for Amici Curiae Technology Companies (Purcell, Annasara) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE of time change as to #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing reset for 4/14/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Hearing inadvertently set for motion to file amicus brief is VACATED. No oral argument is needed as to this motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017) Modified on 4/6/2017 to remove reference to hearing Motion to Intervene which had been vacated by previous order (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2017 Filing 86 Letter from Fenwick & West LLP re Joinder of San Jose/Silicon Valley NAACP in Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Brief and the Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae Southern Poverty Law Center. (Ghassemi-Vanni, Sheeva) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying #84 Motion to Intervene. Because there is no legal basis for Ou-Young's motion to intervene, and because this motion appears to be part of an effort to circumvent the pre-filing requirements to which he is subject, the Court STRIKES Ou-Youngs Motion to Disqualify Judges. Ou-Young shall file no further motions or other filings within or directed at this case or its related cases, Case No. 17-CV-00574-WHO; Case No. 17-00485-WHO; Case No. 17-CV-01535-WHO. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2017 Filing 84 DEFENDANT-INTERVENOR APPLICANT'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO INTERVENE AND MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGES; filed by Kuang-Bao P. Ou-Young. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/12/2017. Replies due by 4/19/2017. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER RESETTING HEARING DATES - Motion Hearing reset for 4/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/28/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 28, 2017 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Supplement Record under Local Rule 7-3(D) filed by County of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Keker, John) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 81 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #79 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Combine Oral Arguments on Preliminary Injunction Motions ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Keker, John) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Donald J. Trump re #79 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Combine Oral Arguments on Preliminary Injunction Motions Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 79 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Combine Oral Arguments on Preliminary Injunction Motions filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 3/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Scott Simpson)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by API Council of San Francisco, California Association of Nonprofits, Coalition of Agencies Serving the Elderly, HIV/AIDS Provider Network, Homeless Emergency Service Providers Association, San Francisco Human Services Network, San Francisco Latino Parity and Equity Coalition, San Francisco Mental Health Contractors Association, Silicon Valley Council of Nonprofits, Abode Services, Asian Americans for Community Involvement, Caminar, Catholic Charities of Santa Clara County, Community Solutions, Destination: Home, Fresh Lifelines for Youth, HealthRIGHT 360, The Health Trust, LifeMoves, Second Harvest Food Bank of Santa Clara and San Mateo Counties, Silicon Valley Independent Living Center of Santa Clara, Inc., West Valley Community Services, Yu-Ai Kai Japanese American Community Senior Service. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/5/2017. Replies due by 4/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Silicon Valley Councel of Nonprofits, Nonprofit Associations, and Nonprofit Organizations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix Appendix A to Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae and Brief of Amici Curiae, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Silicon Valley Council of Nonprofits, Nonprofit Associations, and Nonprofit Organizations' Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae)(Alger, Maureen) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 77 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION , MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Public Schools, Public School Districts, and Associations of Educators. Responses due by 3/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Brief of Amici Curiae, #2 Declaration of Ralph G. Porras, #3 Declaration of Erika Torres, #4 Declaration of Ricardo Mireles, #5 Declaration of Sonia Picos, #6 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Leave)(Teshima, Darren) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 76 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Tahirih Justice Center, et al.. Responses due by 4/5/2017. Replies due by 4/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief, Amici Curiae in Support of Petitioners, #2 Proposed Order)(Gorelick, Jamie) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 75 Brief Amicus Curiae filed byThe Superintendent of Public Instruction. (Smith, Todd) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Motion(s) for Preliminary Injunction filed by County of Alameda, City of Berkeley, City of Davis, City of East Palo Alto, City of Fremont, County of Marin, County of Monterey, City of Mountain View, City of Oakland, City of Richmond, City of Salinas, City Of San Jose, City of Santa Cruz, City of Santa Rosa. Responses due by 4/5/2017. Replies due by 4/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Brief of Amici Curiae California Cities and Counties), #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File as Amici Curiae)(Ross, Linda) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 73 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Motion for Administrative Relief to File Brief of Amici Curiae filed by Ampush Media, Inc., Appboy Inc., Azavea, Checkr, Inc., Chegg Inc., Eventbrite, General Assembly, IDEO, Knotel, Managed by Q Inc., Mapbox, Marin Software, Minted LLC, SugarCRM Inc., Work & Co. Responses due by 3/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Fritz, Kathryn) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Anti-Defamation League in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anti-Defamation League. Responses due by 4/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Amicus Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 71 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to file an Amicus Curiae Brief filed by State of California. Responses due by 3/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMICUS BRIEF)(Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 70 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Lisa Catherine Ehrlich on behalf of State of California. (Ehrlich, Lisa) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to File An Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Constitutional Law Scholars. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Gewertz, Nevin) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 68 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Professors of Constitutional Law, Administrative Law, and Immigration Law. Responses due by 3/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Winner, Sonya) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae filed by Southern Poverty Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Additional Amici, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amicus Curiae Brief)(McClellan, Nathan) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan M McClellan (McClellan, Nathan) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 65 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by Individual Sheriffs and Police Chiefs. Responses due by 3/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amici Curiae Brief of Individual Sheriffs and Police Chiefs, #2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief)(Piers, Matthew) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 64 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION leave to file brief amici curiae of SIREN et al. filed by Asian Law Alliance, Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto, Pangea Legal Services, Services, Immigrants' Rights, and Education Network, Silicon Valley De-Bug. Responses due by 3/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae SIREN et al., #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae of SIREN et al.)(Srikantiah, Jayashri) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Jayashri Srikantiah for Amici Curiae SIREN et al. (Srikantiah, Jayashri) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 62 REPLY (re #43 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byYoung Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley. (Freeman, William) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of 34 Cities and Counties in Support of County of Santa Clara's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Menlo Park, City of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dermody, Kelly) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by John F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 59 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Service Employees International Union, Unite Here Local 19, Working Partnerships USA. Responses due by 3/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief Amici Curiae, #2 Proposed Order)(Prestel, Claire) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire P. Prestel (Prestel, Claire) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Omar C. Jadwat. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Spencer Amdur. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 21, 2017 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre Ivan Segura (Segura, Andre) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11245902.) filed by Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley. (Jadwat, Omar) (Filed on 3/20/2017) Modified on 3/21/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11245757.) filed by Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley. (Amdur, Spencer) (Filed on 3/20/2017) Modified on 3/21/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY (re #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Keker, John) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE by County of Santa Clara of Firm Name and Email Address Change (Keker, John) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 15, 2017 Filing 50 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #43 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byJohn F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Donald J. Trump. (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody H. Wofsy (Wofsy, Cody) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 13, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Wilensky (Wilensky, Julie) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Loy of ACLU Foundation of San Diego & Imperial Counties as Counsel for Plaintiff-Intervenor Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley (Loy, John) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 46 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byJohn F. Kelly, Mick Mulvaney, Jefferson B. Sessions III, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Ltr. from Samuel R. Ramer, Acting Asst Atty Gen., Office of Legis. Affairs)(Simpson, W.) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 7, 2017 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Santa Clara re #44 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/06/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION to Intervene filed by Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/15/2017. Replies due by 3/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Joinder, #4 Declaration, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Freeman, William) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Eugenia Moreno of Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC as Counsel for Plaintiff-Intervenor Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley (Moreno, Catherine) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Freeman of ACLU Foundation of Northern California, Inc. as Counsel for Plaintiff-Intervenor Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley (Freeman, William) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REGARDING AMICUS BRIEFING. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 24, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Simpson Counsel for Defendants (Simpson, W.) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 38 Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 36 Declaration of Cody S. Harris in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Cody S. Harris, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Cody S. Harris, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Cody S. Harris, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Cody S. Harris)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 35 Declaration of Laurie Smith in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 34 Declaration of Jeffrey V. Smith in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 33 Declaration of Jeffrey F. Rosen in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 32 Declaration of Dana Reed in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 31 Declaration of Carl Neusel in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 30 Declaration of Robert Menicocci in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 29 Declaration of Miguel Marquez in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Miguel Marquez, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Miguel Marquez, #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of Miguel Marquez, #4 Exhibit D to Declaration of Miguel Marquez, #5 Exhibit E to Declaration of Miguel Marquez, #6 Exhibit F to Declaration of Miguel Marquez, #7 Exhibit G to Declaration of Miguel Marquez, #8 Exhibit H to Declaration of Miguel Marquez)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 28 Declaration of Paul E. Lorenz in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 27 Declaration of Sara H. Cody, M.D. in Support of #26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by County of Santa Clara. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/9/2017. Replies due by 3/16/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Keker, John) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana Lee Benedict (Benedict, Adriana) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Blau Spiegel (Spiegel, Julia) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Javier Serrano (Serrano, Lawrence) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kavita Kandala Narayan (Narayan, Kavita) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Luce Goldstein (Goldstein, Danielle) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Greta Suzanne Hansen (Hansen, Greta) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James Robyzad Williams (Williams, James) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 13, 2017 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by County of Santa Clara. All Defendants. (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 13, 2017 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Santa Clara (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 13, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is: Summons Service Executed. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #17 Certificate of Service filed by County of Santa Clara (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 8, 2017 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE: Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins regarding Discovery Matters re #15 Order of Recusal. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case.. (Please note: This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/7/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Mark Sandy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Dana J Boente, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to John F. Kelly, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Donald J. Trump, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Andrew Bayley (Bayley, Edward) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Samuel Goldberg (Goldberg, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Shawn Harris (Harris, Cody) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Edward Purcell (Purcell, Daniel) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by County of Santa Clara [AMENDED]. (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 6, 2017 Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office due to incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. Civil Cover Sheet does not indicate selection of "Nature of Suit". Please make selection under Nature of Suit and file Amended Civil Cover Sheet as separate docket entry. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by County of Santa Clara (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 5 Case assigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Santa Clara.. (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Keker, John) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11131103.). Filed byCounty of Santa Clara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keker, John) (Filed on 2/3/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Santa Clara v. Donald J. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Adriana Lee Benedict
Represented By: Danielle Luce Goldstein
Represented By: Cody Shawn Harris
Represented By: Nicholas Samuel Goldberg
Represented By: Lawrence Javier Serrano
Represented By: Daniel Edward Purcell
Represented By: James Robyzad Williams
Represented By: Edward Andrew Bayley
Represented By: Julia Blau Spiegel
Represented By: John Watkins Keker
Represented By: Greta Suzanne Hansen
Represented By: Kavita Kandala Narayan
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: Julie Wilensky
Represented By: Robert A. Van Nest
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana J. Boente
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sandy
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine C. Duke
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Jefferson B. Sessions
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, OMB Mick Mulvaney
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: W. Scott Simpson
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LifeMoves
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Salinas
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Administrative Law Professors
Represented By: Ann Margaret O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Second Harvest Food Bank of Santa Clara and San Mateo Counties
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Professors of Constitutional Law, Administrative Law, and Immigration Law
Represented By: Sonya Diane Winner
Represented By: Nevin Merrill Gewertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Superintendent of Public Instruction
Represented By: Thomas Howard Prouty
Represented By: Todd Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Appboy Inc.
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ampush Media, Inc.
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Anti-Defamation League
Represented By: Robert Ward Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Homeless Emergency Service Providers Association
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Political Science Scholars
Represented By: Daniel Jeffrey Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greater Birmingham Ministries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of California
Represented By: Lisa Catherine Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans for Community Involvement
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Worker Justice Center of New York, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Schools, Public School Districts, and Associations of Educators
Represented By: Darren S. Teshima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Silicon Valley Council of Nonprofits
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Abode Services
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Constitutional Law Scholars
Represented By: Nevin Merrill Gewertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LatinoJustice PRLDEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Silicon Valley De-Bug
Represented By: Jennifer Lori Stark
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SugarCRM Inc.
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Oakland
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of New Orleans
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwest Forest Worker Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: We Belong Together
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eventbrite
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: 48 Cities and Counties
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Fremont
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigrant Legal Resource Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Immigration Law Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Florida Immigrant Coaltion, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fresh Lifelines for Youth
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Berkeley
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Workers Defense Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Latin American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Menlo Park
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice - Asian Law Caucus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Florida Legal Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Work & Co
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: San Jose/Silicon Valley NAACP
Represented By: Sheeva June Ghassemi-Vanni
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Association of Nonprofits
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Services, Immigrants' Rights, and Education Network
Represented By: Jennifer Lori Stark
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IDEO
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Greater Rochester Coalition for Immigration Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Azavea
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: San Francisco Human Services Network
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Santa Rosa
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: San Francisco Latino Parity and Equity Coalition
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Health Trust
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Community Colleges
Represented By: Robin Bradle Johansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Catholic Charities of Santa Clara County
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tahirih Justice Center, et al.
Represented By: Jamie S. Gorelick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Law Alliance
Represented By: Jennifer Lori Stark
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Equal Rights Advocates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Solutions
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: General Assembly
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Marin
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: West Valley Community Services
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice - AAJC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Alameda
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Davis
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Checkr, Inc.
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Unite Here Local 19
Represented By: Leo Gertner
Represented By: Deborah Smith
Represented By: Nicole Gina Berner
Represented By: Claire P. Prestel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Destination: Home
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southern Poverty Law Center
Represented By: Nathan M McClellan
Represented By: Christopher S. Burrichter
Represented By: Fred T. Magaziner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Employment Law Project
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Refugee and Immigrant Center for Education and Legal Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: API Council of San Francisco
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Knotel
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: St. Louis Workers Education Society
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Working Partnerships USA
Represented By: Leo Gertner
Represented By: Claire P. Prestel
Represented By: Deborah Smith
Represented By: Nicole Gina Berner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: San Francisco Mental Health Contractors Association
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Worksafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Justice in Motion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City Of San Jose
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Minted LLC
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chegg Inc.
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Americans Advancing Justice-Atlanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Richmond
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: States of West Virginia, Louisiana, et al.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Individual Sheriffs and Police Chiefs
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Yu-Ai Kai Japanese American Community Senior Service
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HealthRIGHT 360
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adelante Alabama Worker Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Orleans Workers' Center for Racial Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Center for Lesbian Rights
Represented By: Amy Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Leo Gertner
Represented By: Deborah Smith
Represented By: Nicole Gina Berner
Represented By: Claire P. Prestel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Mountain View
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alabama Coalition for Immigrant Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mapbox
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Pangea Legal Services
Represented By: Jennifer Lori Stark
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jobs With Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Santa Cruz
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Silicon Valley Independent Living Center of Santa Clara, Inc.
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Americans for Immigrant Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coalition of Agencies Serving the Elderly
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Safe Horizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tennessee Immigrant and Refugee Rights Coalition
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Southeast Immigrant Rights Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Marin Software
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Community Legal Services in East Palo Alto
Represented By: Jennifer Lori Stark
Represented By: Jayashri Srikantiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Caminar
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of East Palo Alto
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HIV/AIDS Provider Network
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Federation of Teachers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Managed by Q Inc.
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Kathryn J Fritz
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Meghan Rhea
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: County of Monterey
Represented By: Linda Margaret Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Young Women's Christian Association of Silicon Valley
Represented By: Catherine Eugenia Moreno
Represented By: Ava R Miller
Represented By: William S. Freeman
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass, Esq.
Represented By: Ralitza S. Dineva
Represented By: John David Loy
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Represented By: Michael Roland Petrocelli
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Represented By: Spencer Elijah Wittmann Amdur
Represented By: Angelica H Salceda
Represented By: Julia Harumi Mass
Represented By: Angelica Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Kuang-Bao P. Ou-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?