Krzysztof Wolinski v. M. Colvin et al

Plaintiff: Krzysztof Wolinski
Defendant: M. Colvin, D. Farmer, C. Garcia, S. Hatton and S. Ahmann
Case Number: 3:2017cv00583
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE 21 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
July 31, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT 19 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
June 8, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING MOTION TO REMAND 17 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/8/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krzysztof Wolinski v. M. Colvin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krzysztof Wolinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Colvin
Represented By: Ian Michael Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Farmer
Represented By: Ian Michael Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Garcia
Represented By: Ian Michael Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Hatton
Represented By: Ian Michael Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Ahmann
Represented By: Ian Michael Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?