Cunha v. Intellicheck, LLC et al

Plaintiff: James Cunha
Defendant: Intellicheck, LLC and Chico Produce, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00597
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR STRIKE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
April 20, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Intellicheck, LLC filed by Intellicheck, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
March 30, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Intellicheck, LLC to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Intellicheck, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunha v. Intellicheck, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cunha
Represented By: Walter Lewis Haines
Represented By: Patrick Nathaniel Keegan
Represented By: James Michael Treglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intellicheck, LLC
Represented By: Selyn Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chico Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Victoria Lin
Represented By: Derek Stanley Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?