Green v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Morris Green, Jr.
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and S.F. Public Utilities Commission
Case Number: 3:2017cv00607
Filed: February 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Discovery Order (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Discovery Order. Oral argument is set for September 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A on the 15th floor for the letter briefs concerning Special Interrogatory No. 19, Requests for Production Nos. 38 & 39, and Special Interrogatory No. 22. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/30/2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion Seeking Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint in conformity with the attached order within 30 days. The Court ORDERS that disco very in this case is REOPENED as to the amendments allowed by this order. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer concerning when the fact discovery cutoff should be for this reopened discovery. The parties shall file a letter brief within 14 days stating each sides proposal with a brief explanation.(tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 77 Motion to Reopen Discovery. Fact discovery on existing claims shall close on March 29, 2019. (tshlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Green, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.F. Public Utilities Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?