Kirlin Builders, LLC v. North American Specialty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kirlin Builders, LLC
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv00608
Filed: February 7, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice and Proposed Order filed by Kirlin Builders, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
May 31, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation filed by Kirlin Builders, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
April 27, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference and Other Pending Deadlines filed by Kirlin Builders, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 24, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Kirlin Builders, LLC filed by Kirlin Builders, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 24, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirlin Builders, LLC v. North American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirlin Builders, LLC
Represented By: Michael Wayne Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?