Azad et al v. Tokio Marine HCC - Medical Insurance Services Group et al

Plaintiff: Mohammed Azad and Danielle Buckley
Defendant: Tokio Marine HCC - Medical Insurance Services Group, Health Insurance Innovations, Inc., HCC Life Insurance Company and Consumer Benefits of America
Case Number: 3:2017cv00618
Filed: February 7, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE AND STRIKING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 09/22/2017. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
August 7, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 87 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File First Amended Complaint. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 14, 2017 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton Granting 48 , 58 , 60 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss with Leave to Amend; Denying 49 HCC's Motion to Strike; Denying 60 HII's Motion to Strike.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
May 26, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 63 Motion to Stay without Prejudice and Vacating Case Management Conference. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azad et al v. Tokio Marine HCC - Medical Insurance Services Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Azad
Represented By: James Allen Carney
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Prewitt
Represented By: David F. Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Buckley
Represented By: James Allen Carney
Represented By: Kelly M. Dermody
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Rachel Geman
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Prewitt
Represented By: David F. Slade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine HCC - Medical Insurance Services Group
Represented By: Michael Scott Incerto
Represented By: Michelle Lynnea Mello
Represented By: Gerard G Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Insurance Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Herling
Represented By: Garry W. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCC Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Scott Incerto
Represented By: Michelle Lynnea Mello
Represented By: Gerard G Pecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Benefits of America
Represented By: David W. Evans
Represented By: Howard Michael Garfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?