Clevlen v. Anthera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brian Clevlen
Defendant: Anthera Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Paul F. Truex, Craig Thompson, May Liu and William Shanahan
Case Number: 3:2017cv00715
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 Setting Pleading and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/5/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 18, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting movant's appointment as lead plaintiff and approval of lead counsel. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/18/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
March 10, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 13 to Continue Initial CMC, reset related deadlines and extend defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/9/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clevlen v. Anthera Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthera Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Nicholas A Reider
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul F. Truex
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Nicholas A Reider
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Thompson
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Nicholas A Reider
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Liu
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Nicholas A Reider
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Shanahan
Represented By: Michael T. Jones
Represented By: Nicholas A Reider
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Clevlen
Represented By: Stephanie A. Bartone
Represented By: Shannon L Hopkins
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?