Burton v. Smart Living Company et al

Plaintiff: Donna Burton
Defendant: Smart Living Company and EMerchantclub, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00718
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Stipulation TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
June 7, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/7/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
May 9, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 8, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Stephen Terry Holzer terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Smart Living Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Burton
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smart Living Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMerchantclub, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?