Infante v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Cecilia F. Infante
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00793
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/16/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/22/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Heather M. Shumaker is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infante v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia F. Infante
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Laszlo Ladi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Heather M. Shumaker
Represented By: David James Streza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?