Dulberg v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Dulberg
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc. and Rasier, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00850
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER DENYING 175 MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT AND RESOLVING 176 MOTION FOR EXTENSION. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER RE 165 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST FOR EXPENSES AND ATTORNEYS FEES. By Judge Alsup. The parties shall please file a proposed Judgment by Thursday at noon. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING 156 REVISED CLASS SETTLEMENT. By Judge Alsup. Modifications to notice and settlement due by 8/1/19 at noon. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING 66 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 70 72 106 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 (PUBLIC REFILING OF 80 pursuant to 80 ) ORDER GRANTING 67 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING 38 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 28 Stipulation]. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER CONTINUANCES.(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dulberg v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Dulberg
Represented By: Andrew Dressel
Represented By: Jennifer R. Liakos
Represented By: Paul B Maslo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan R. Bass
Represented By: Susan K. Jamison
Represented By: Skye DeLainna Yveth Langs
Represented By: Clifford Eric Yin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan R. Bass
Represented By: Susan K. Jamison
Represented By: Skye DeLainna Yveth Langs
Represented By: Clifford Eric Yin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?