Castillo v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Sergio Castillo
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00919
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/03/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 7, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. William H. Orrick. The 20 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is treated as a motion to dismiss and is GRANTED. Castillo shall have leave to amend and may file his first amended complaint, if any, within twenty days of the date of this order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
May 30, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/30/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Castillo
Represented By: Jonathan A Stieglitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?