Duke Partners II, LLC v. Casillas et al

Plaintiff: Duke Partners II, LLC
Defendant: Arnoldo G. Casillas and Irma V. Jasso
Case Number: 3:2017cv00936
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 10, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-4335. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/10/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
May 11, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION by Judge William Alsup [granting 6 Motion to Remand]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 6, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/6/2017. Show Cause Response due by 4/14/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duke Partners II, LLC v. Casillas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duke Partners II, LLC
Represented By: Sam Chandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnoldo G. Casillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma V. Jasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?