Doe v. Uber Technologies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00950
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER. Uber's motion to transfer venue to the District of Minnesota is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 16, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REQUESTING ORDER CHANGING TIME. Case Management Conference continued to 6/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/16/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
March 24, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED AS "JANE DOE" by Hon. William H. Orrick. Plaintiff's application to proceed using a pseudonym is GRANTED, subject to reconsideration as the case progresses. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Marlene Jaye Goldenberg
Represented By: Sara M Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: James Egan Sell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?