TMCO LTD. v. Green Light Energy Solutions R&D Corp.
Plaintiff: TMCO LTD.
Defendant: Green Light Energy Solutions R&D Corp.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00997
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Sua Sponte Judicial Referral to Determine Whether Cases Are Related. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse on April 14, 2021. (agtlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $2,155,245.41 as to Green Light Energy Solutions R&D Corp., Alex M. Feerer, and Green Light Energy Solutions, LLC for the U.S. Marshals, Northern District of California. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 WRIT of Execution issued as to Green Light Energy Solutions R&D Corp., Alex M. Feerer, and Green Light Energy Solutions, LLC in the amount of $2,155,245.41 for the U.S. Marshals, Northern District of California. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting Plaintiff's 38 Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Alter Ego Defendants. Court to enter amended judgment. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying without prejudice 44 Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal as Counsel. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Defendant and Non-Parties. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2020. ORDER Continuing Hearing on 38 MOTION to Amend/Correct Judgment To Add Alter Ego Defendants to 2/20/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Opposition to pending motion due by 1/27/2020. Reply due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/10/2020. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting TMCO Ltd.'s 1 , 26 Petition to confirm arbitration award and enter judgment. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TMCO LTD. v. Green Light Energy Solutions R&D Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TMCO LTD.
Represented By: Peter J. Diedrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Light Energy Solutions R&D Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?