Hunter Douglas Inc. et al v. Ching Feng Home Fashions Co., Ltd.

Plaintiff: Hunter Douglas Inc. and Andrew J. Toti Testamentary Trust
Defendant: Ching Feng Home Fashions Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01069
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 77 to Enlarge Time for Defendant to Serve Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 7, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 73 TO ENLARGE TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHING FENG HOME FASHIONS CO., LTD. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 13, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 66 Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/12/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter Douglas Inc. et al v. Ching Feng Home Fashions Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Douglas Inc.
Represented By: Megan E. Bussey
Represented By: Kent Thomas Dallow
Represented By: Matthew Christian Holohan
Represented By: A. James Isbester
Represented By: Miranda Rogers
Represented By: Frederick L. Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. Toti Testamentary Trust
Represented By: Megan E. Bussey
Represented By: Kent Thomas Dallow
Represented By: Matthew Christian Holohan
Represented By: A. James Isbester
Represented By: Miranda Rogers
Represented By: Frederick L. Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ching Feng Home Fashions Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Brian Joseph Ankenbrandt
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Burnim
Represented By: Jay Chiu
Represented By: Harold H. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Peter Edward Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?