Beautiful Slides, Inc. et al v. Allen

Plaintiff: Beautiful Slides, Inc. and Mitch Grasso
Defendant: May Allen
Case Number: 3:2017cv01091
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM. The July 21, 2017 hearing is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/14/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
May 5, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON COUNTER-DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the hearing on the motion is continued to July 21, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. The case management conference is continued to August 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
March 27, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beautiful Slides, Inc. et al v. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beautiful Slides, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Frimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Grasso
Represented By: William J. Frimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?