Im v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Un U Im
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01092
Filed: March 2, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT DALE FIETZ; DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT AGNES GROGAN; EXTENDING IN PART EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Defendant's motion to exclu de Dale Fietz is granted. Defendant's motion to exclude Agnes Grogan is denied, provided plaintiff serves on defendant, no later than June 4, 2018, a supplement to Grogan's report. If defendant wishes to designate thereafter an expert in t he same area of expertise, defendant shall do so no later than June 11, 2018. As to Grogan and any such expert so designated by defendant, the expert discovery cutoff is extended to July 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 18, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
December 22, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO MODIFY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 22, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
October 30, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
September 6, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.'S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AGAINST SOUTH/WIN, LTD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 6, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
June 2, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/2/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Im v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Un U Im
Represented By: Gunter Andrei Mihaescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Seth Goodman
Represented By: Paige Pei-Yu Yeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?