Van Elzen et al v. Tax Group Center, Inc.

Plaintiff: David Van Elzen and Ronald Rodriguez
Defendant: Tax Group Center, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01105
Filed: March 3, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peluso, Patrick. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
June 13, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Stipulation Setting Revised Pretrial Schedule. Amended Pleadings due by 9/5/2017; Close of Fact Discovery / Designation of Experts due by 12/12/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 1/12/2018; Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/12/2018; Motions due by 8/3/2018; Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 2, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 29 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 11, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Elzen et al v. Tax Group Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Van Elzen
Represented By: Blake Dugger
Represented By: Steven L Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rodriguez
Represented By: Blake Dugger
Represented By: Steven L Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Group Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?