Frost v. United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Vinton P. Frost
Defendant: United States Department of Justice, Melanie Ann Pustay and Sean O'Neill
Case Number: 3:2017cv01240
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 COURTS CERTIFICATION THAT APPEAL IS NOT TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 1, 2021. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER DISMISSING UNSERVED DEFENDANTS AND FINAL JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE RE-ENTERED. Show Cause Response due by 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 23, 2020. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT WITH RESPECT TO ADEQUACY OF FBI SEARCH. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on March 13, 2019. (jcslc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2019: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinton P. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Ann Pustay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?