Orea v. Bank of America Corporation

Plaintiff: Alfredo Leon Orea
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2017cv01253
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation To Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/6/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 19, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation RE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 12, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 32 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Case Management Conference on June 13, 2017. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
June 9, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Motion to Appear by Telephone At the Case Management Conference on June 13, 2017. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
April 26, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 STIPULATION RE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 5/29/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orea v. Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Leon Orea
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?