Woolley et al v. Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Smith, Anthony Look, Jr., Mary J Loudenslager-Smith, Lt. Joseph J. Galaska, George W. Woolley, Michael G. Pekel, Kimberly Look, Tammy S. Woolley, Grachian L. Smith, Alejandro Marcey and Felicia Marcey
Defendant: Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. and Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv01258
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 294 CLERK'S NOTICE: The court issues this minute entry to document that it stayed the case previously pending the appeal. (ECF Nos. 268, 274.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER of USCA as to #271 20-16608 (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER of USCA (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2021)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER of USCA No. 20-16608 (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 290 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ali M Abugheida (Abugheida, Ali) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
December 7, 2020 Filing 289 NOTICE of Change of Address by Graham Bruce LippSmith NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM AFFILIATION AND CHANGE OF ADDRESS (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 12/7/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 288 Transcript of Zoom Webinar Proceedings held on October 15, 2020, before Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #285 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2021. (Related documents(s) #285 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER of USCA as to #271 (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 286 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/15/20 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER. In the attached order, the court grants #267 the defendants' motion for summary judgment. (lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 283 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing and Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 10/15/2020. Matter is argued, submitted and taken under submission. Total Time in Court: 12 minutes. Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jaclyn Anderson and Graham Lippsmith. Defendants' Attorneys: Frederick Levin and Ali Abugheida. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 282 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Abugheida, Ali) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
September 30, 2020 Filing 281 REPLY (re #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 280 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 10/22/2020 is advanced to 10/15/2020 at 9:30 AM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court procee dings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Fil ed on 9/25/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 279 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 278 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 11/02/17 before Judge Laurel Beeler, (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER re #276 Alternative Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due 9/16/2020. Defendants' Reply In Support of the Motion for Summary Judgment due 9/30/2020. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 09/01/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/16/2020. Replies due by 9/30/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 276 STIPULATION re #267 MOTION for Summary Judgment FOR ALTERNATIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Lt. Joseph J. Galaska, Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Mary J Loudenslager-Smith, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, Grachian L. Smith, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER. The court thanks the parties for their status update and arguments. For the reasons stated in the court's order denying stay, the court will consider Ygrene's pending motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/28/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 274 STATUS REPORT Per ECF No. 270 by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Abugheida, Ali) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 273 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 8/17/18, 1/10/19, 12/5/19, 2/20/20, 4/16/20 and 6/4/20 before Judge Laurel Beeler, re #269 USCA Order Transcript due by 10/21/2020. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 272 Notice of Appeal FEE PAID (Filing fee$505,receipt number 0971-14854697). (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 271 USCA Case Number 20-16608 for #259 USCA Case Number. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER. The court asks the parties to submit a joint status update, no more than six pages, regarding their views on the procedural posture of the case given the Ninth Circuit's granting of the plaintiffs' petition. See ECF No. 269. The court asks the parties to submit the update as soon as practicable, and in any event by Wednesday 8/26/2020. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/21/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER of USCA as to #259 USCA Case Number within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioner shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying #260 Motion to Stay. In the attached order, the court denies a complete stay on this record and will consider Ygrene's summary-judgment motion. (lblc5S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 267 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/2/2020. Replies due by 9/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin, #4 Declaration of Laura Strothmann, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Laura Strothmann, #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Laura Strothmann)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 266 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 8/20/2020 is reset to 10/22/2020 at 9:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 265 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing #260 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 23(f) PETITION and Further Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.usco urts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the cou rt. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 264 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 263 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 8/13/2020 is reset to 8/20/2020 at 9:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 262 REPLY (re #260 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 23(f) PETITION ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 261 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #260 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 23(f) PETITION ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 260 MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING FED. R. CIV. P. RULE 23(f) PETITION filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 7/27/2020. Replies due by 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 259 USCA Case Number 20-80088 9th Circuit (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 258 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/4/20, before Judge Laurel Beeler. Court ReporterKatherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #255 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2020. (Related documents(s) #255 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/04/2020 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 256 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom Webinar on 6/4/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/6/2020. Total Time in Court: 36 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Graham Lippsmith and Jaclyn Anderson. Defendants' Attorneys: Frederick Levin, Ali Abugheida and Michael Rome. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2020)
June 4, 2020 Filing 255 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 6/4/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 254 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT RE CASE SCHEDULE filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER: There is a CMC set in this case for next Thursday, June 4, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. The court asks the parties to confer on a schedule and to submit a new case schedule by Monday, June 1, 2020, at 2 p.m. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/29/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. In the attached order, the court denies the motion to certify the proposed classes and denies the motions to strike the expert submissions. The parties must confer on a new case schedule. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 251 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/4/2020 at 9:30 AM. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the hearing must be done by sending a list of names of participating counsel to lbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on Wednesday, June 3, 2020. All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/83372151690?pwd=SUR5OUtVbGpTdVdQNGk4ZHJVaW1xQT09Meeting ID: 833 7215 1690Password: 469885Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE-MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FROM 5/21/2020 TO 6/4/2020 at 09:30 AM. The court is not able to get its order out before the parties' CMC statement is due tomorrow. In aid of a useful CMC, the court continues the CMC from 5/21/2020 to 6/4/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
May 12, 2020 Filing 250 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM WEBINAR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON 5/21/2020. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL REQUIRED -- SEE BELOW. The case management conference set in this case on 5/21/2020 at 9:30 AM will be held by Zoom Webinar. Pre-registration by counsel with the clerk in advance of the hearing must be done by sending a list of names & emails of participating counsel to lbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than noon on Wednesday, May 20, 2020. Please click the link below to join the webinar: https://us02web.zoom.us/j/84243835009?pwd=MHpFdFJNdStNd2VMNm9wOGdjcXJuQT09Password: 330507Or iPhone one-tap : US: +19292056099,,84243835009# or +12532158782,,84243835009# Or Telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 929 205 6099 or +1 253 215 8782 or +1 301 715 8592 or +1 312 626 6799 or +1 346 248 7799 or +1 669 900 6833 Webinar ID: 842 4383 5009 Password: 330507 International numbers available: https://us02web.zoom.us/u/kkrrGGP7w Or an H.323/SIP room system: H.323: 162.255.37.11 (US West) or 162.255.36.11 (US East) Meeting ID: 842 4383 5009 Password: 330507 SIP: 84243835009@zoomcrc.com Password: 330507 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying without prejudice #248 Motion for Discovery. The court directs the parties to meet-and-confer and, if they cannot resolve their dispute, submit a joint letter brief. If the court needs additional briefing, it will direct the plaintiffs to renotice its motion to compel. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 248 MOTION for Discovery TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO SUBPOENAS TO NON-PARTY WILLDAN FINANCIAL SERVICES filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 5/20/2020. Replies due by 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER of USCA. Petitioners' motion to withdraw this petition for permission to appeal is GRANTED. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 246 NOTICE by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley , of Order Transferring Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoenas to Non-Party Willdan Financial Services Pursuant to Rule 45(f) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 245 Transcript of Electronic Recorded Proceedings held on April 16, 2020, before Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #242 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2020. (Related documents(s) #242 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Order granting #229 Motion for Reconsideration entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.The court previously granted Ygrene's motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration, for the reasons stated at the March 2, 2020 hearing and today. The court now grants the motion for reconsideration, for the same reasons. The most important reason is that the court did not consider adequately the evidence about exposure (instead focusing too closely on the marketing materials themselves). To remedy this defect, the court withdraws its previous order granting class certification and will issue an order that more specifically addresses the evidence submitted in support of the class-certification motion. The court will try to issue a new order before the next case-management conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 16, 2020 Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 242 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/16/2020 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing held telephonically on 4/16/2020. Matter is argued, submitted and taken under submission. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 4/23/2020 is reset to 5/21/2020 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Total Time in Court: 43 minutes.AT&T Teleconference Time: 11:14-11:57. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jaclyn Anderson and Michael Rhone. Defendants' Attorneys: Frederick Levin and Ali Abugheida. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2020) Modified on 4/16/2020: Matter transcribed by Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2020 Filing 240 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing #229 MOTION for Reconsideration re #228 Order, Certifying Classes set for 4/16/2020 at 9:30 AM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Related documents(s) #229 )(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER. The court apologizes to the parties for the late notice, but it has three motions that were recently filed relating to COVID-19 issues. The court thus continues the telephonic hearing one week to Thursday, 4/16/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (The official docket entry will be tomorrow.) The court also may have the ability to have a hearing by Zoom, and asks the parties to confer tomorrow by 1 p.m. and email the court (at that time) if they think a video conference might be a better way of conducting the hearing. The court can host the hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 238 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM. Dial In: 877-336-1839Access Code: 8191201# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 237 REPLY (re #229 MOTION for Reconsideration re #228 Order, Certifying Classes ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 236 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #234 ) (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #229 MOTION for Reconsideration re #228 Order, Certifying Classes. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 235 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: UPDATED CALL-IN INFORMATION FOR CMC/MOTION HEARING: The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone:Dial In: 877-336-1839Access Code: 8191201# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no ocument associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 234 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #229 MOTION for Reconsideration re #228 Order, Certifying Classes ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Exhibit 1)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler regarding the parties discoveries dispute (ECF 208), as discussed on the record at the previous hearing. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/18/2020. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 232 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / MOTION HEARING: Through at least May 1, 2020, the court (under the new General Orders 72 and 73, available at https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/information-regarding-covid-19) will not have any in-person civil case-management conferences or civil-motions hearings and instead will have telephonic appearances or decide the matters on the papers. For now, the court is converting all appearances to telephone appearances but may on a case-by-case basis take things off calendar. For motions hearings, the court is open to hearings by Skype for Business or Google Hangouts (and may be able to use Zoom eventually). Telephonic appearances generally are by CourtCall, but the court also circulates the following conference number, which can accommodate up to 200 people and allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone: Dial In: 877-336-1839Access Code: 8191201#Security Code: 200423# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 231 CLERKS NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / MOTION HEARING: Through at least April 17, 2020, the court will not have any in-person civil case-management conferences or civil motions hearings and instead will have telephonic appearances. For motions hearings, the court is open to hearings by Skype for Business or Google Hangouts (because for now, the court cannot host conferences by Zoom). (This latter approach requires IT staff to provide the court with a web cam so there may be some delay.) Telephonic appearances generally are by CourtCall, but the court also circulates the following conference number, which can accommodate up to 200 people and allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone: Dial In: 877-336-1839 Access Code: 8191201#Security Code: 200409# (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 16, 2020 Filing 230 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing #229 MOTION for Reconsideration set for 4/9/2020 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 3/19/2020. Replies due by 3/26/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 229 MOTION for Reconsideration re #228 Order, Certifying Classes filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of Court Order Certifying Classes, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Proposed Order)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 UNREDACTED ORDER Certifying Classes. For the reasons discussed on the record, the court enters its class certification order without redactions. The court recognizes that it previously allowed some of the material within this order to be filed under seal, but feels that the previously redacted material no longer merits being redacted in light of the applicable standards. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/03/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Filing 227 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Further Case Management Conference previously set for 3/26/2020 is reset to 4/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Order: For the reasons discussed on the record at the 2/20/2020 hearing, the court denies #198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Order : For the reasons discussed on the record at the 2/20/2020 hearing, the court denies #196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler denying #191 Motion for Protective Order; denying #205 Motion for Protective Order because the plaintiffs have not established a clear record of abuse or of likelihood of serious abuse. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order granting #197 Motion for Leave to File entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.For the reasons stated on the record, the court grants the motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 221 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 02/20/20, before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590. Tape Number: FTR 10:11 - 11:01. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #219 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2020. (Related documents(s) #219 ) (tgj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 220 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 219 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/20/2020 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 218 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing and Further Case Management Conference held on 2/20/2020. Parties to file a Motion for Reconsideration within two weeks. Defendants' counsel invites a submission for any additional evidence. Court to issue an order. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Total Time in Court: 50 minutes. FTR Time: 10:11-11:01. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jaclyn Anderson and Graham Lippsmith (Phone). Defendants' Attorneys: Frederick Levin and Ali Abugheida. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/20/2020) Modified on 2/25/2020: Matter transcribed by Tara (Bauer) Jauregui (ECHO Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2020 Filing 217 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 216 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Related document(s) #213 ) (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 6, 2020 Filing 215 REPLY (re #205 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Defendants' Communications ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 214 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #197 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 4, 2020 Filing 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #211 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Parties are to make arrangements through CourtCall. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 211 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Further Case Management Conference filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
February 3, 2020 Filing 210 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 209 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #205 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Defendants' Communications ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 208 Statement re #184 Order on Discovery Letter Brief Joint Update by Anthony Look, Jr. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 207 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and Related Documents ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 206 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Statement ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 205 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Defendants' Communications filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 1/30/2020. Replies due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying #190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The defendants did not file a response, as required under local rule 79-5, and none of the redacted material has been marked confidential by either party. The plaintiffs will re-file their motion for a protective order without redactions. All other deadlines remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 203 STIPULATION re #184 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 202 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The court has a pretrial conference on 1/30/2020 and thus moves the CMC to the motions date of 2/20/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying #192 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER APPROVING re #195 Stipulation For Additional Time to Provide Update Re Discovery Order filed by Anthony Look, Jr., Alejandro Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley, Kimberly Look, Felicia Marcey. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/22/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 199 Statement re #187 Order Joint Statement Regarding Sealing by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Statement Regarding Sealing)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Statement filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Joint Statement Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Joint Statement Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version - Exhibit A to Joint Statement, #4 Unredacted Version - Exhibit A to Joint Statement)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and Related Documents filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Motion for Reconsideration and Related Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Motion for Reconsideration and Related Documents Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version - Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to File a Motion for Reconsideration, #4 Unredacted Version - Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to File a Motion for Reconsideration)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 195 STIPULATION re #184 Order on Discovery Letter Brief filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 194 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of #187 Order Re Sealing filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Related document(s) #187 ) (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 193 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #192 Ex Parte Application re #191 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Defendants' Communications ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 192 Ex Parte Application re #191 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Defendants' Communications filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 191 MOTION for Protective Order Limiting Defendants' Communications filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 1/30/2020. Replies due by 2/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 190 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications and Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time re Motion filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith ISO Admin Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order re Admin Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #5 Proposed Order Redacted Version of [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #6 Proposed Order Unredacted Version of [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #7 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time re Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #8 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time re Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #9 Declaration Redacted Version of Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time re Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #10 Declaration Unredacted Version of Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time re Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time re Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time re Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications, #13 Proposed Order re Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time re Plaintiffs Motion for Protective Order Limiting Defendants Communications)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Order terminating #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.The court terminates the administrative motion for the reasons set forth in the order at ECF No. 187. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER. The court clarifies that it will email the parties its class-certification order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER RE SEALING. In the attached order, the court sets forth a process to address any sealing issues and directs a joint response from the parties by 1/21/2020. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 22, 2019 Filing 185 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/05/2019, before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #182 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2020. (Related documents(s) #182 ) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #151 Discovery Letter Brief. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/2019 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/2019 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 181 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/5/2019 11:30:52 AM ]. File Size [ 22312 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:46:29 ]. (courtspeak).
December 5, 2019 Filing 180 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2019. Matter is taken under submission. Court will issue an order. Total Time in Court: 47 minutes. FTR Time: 11:30-12:17. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Graham LippSmith, Jaclyn Anderson and Sophia Gold. Defendants' Attorneys: Fredrick Levin, Ali Abugheida and Michael Rome. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019: Matter transcribed by Peggy Schuerger (AdHoc Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2019 Filing 179 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of #137 MOTION to Certify Class , Second Supplemental filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #137 ) (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: The plaintiffs filed a declaration (the Cox declaration at ECF 137-4) in support of their motion for class certification. It cites several documents with the bates coding "P000-" in paragraph 10(c). The court may be missing something, but it did not see the documents in the electronic filings or the chambers submissions. The court asks the plaintiffs to let the court know where they are in the record, and if they are not in the record, to file the documents and lodge chambers copies as soon as practicable. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 177 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of #137 MOTION to Certify Class , Supplemental Declaration filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Production, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ygrene Production (Sought To Be Sealed), #3 Exhibit 3 - Makowski Depo Exhibits 1056-1058 Sought To Be Sealed, #4 Exhibit 4 - Makowski Depo Exhibits 1061-1066 (Sought To Be Sealed)(Related document(s) #137 ) (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 2, 3 and 4 to the Supplemental Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Ygrene Production, Part 1 of 2 (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 2 - Ygrene Production, Part 2 of 2 (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 3 - Makowski Depo Exhibits 1056-1058 (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit 4 - Makowski Depo Exhibits 1061-1066, Part 1 of 2 (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 4 - Makowski Depo Exhibits 1061-1066, Part 2 of 2 (Unredacted))(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 175 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motions to File Under Seal [ECF Nos. 152, 155, 158, and 171] filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #161 #166 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. The court grants Ygrene's motions to seal at docket entries 1161 and 166. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER PROVISIONALLY DENYING PLAINTIFFS' SEALING MOTIONS.In the attached order, the court provisionally denies the sealing motions on the ground that it does not see Ygrene's declaration (as the designating party) establishing the rules for sealing. The order allows a week to submit the declaration (or point out where in the record it is). (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 172 REPLY (re #157 MOTION to Strike #144 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,, DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR DOMINIQUE M. HANSSENS, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS' REPLY INSUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR DOMINIQUE M. HANSSENS, PH.D. IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply ISO Motion to Strike Hanssens' Declaration, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply ISO Motion to Strike Hanssens' Declaration)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 170 CLERK'S NOTICE: Last hearing date for dispositive motions and/or further case-management conference previously set for 1/31/2020 at 9:30 AM/11:00 AM is reset to 1/30/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER re #168 to Continue Hearing Date of Motion for Class Certification and Motions to Strike. Motions Hearing previously set for 11/14/2019 is reset to 12/5/2019 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/25/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 168 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #137 MOTION to Certify Class , #157 MOTION to Strike #144 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,, DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR DOMINIQUE M. HANSSENS, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, #145 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #146 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Redacted] , TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 167 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #157 MOTION to Strike #144 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,, DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR DOMINIQUE M. HANSSENS, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Oppostion to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 166 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants Administrative Motion to File Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion, #3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Oppostion to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Oppostion to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Oppostion to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #6 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Oppostion to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #7 Unedacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Oppostion to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 165 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTIONS HEARING: Based on the court's schedule and for efficiency in addressing the motions, the court sets all motions on calendar for 11/14/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The court appreciates the parties' offer of an abbreviated briefing schedule on the motion to strike but is concerned about possibly tight timing. To the extent that the parties submit their briefing on that abbreviated schedule, however, it may aid the court in efficiently addressing the disputes, so the court would appreciate that accommodation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 164 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of #163 Reply to Opposition/Response, #162 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin)(Related document(s) #163 , #162 ) (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 163 REPLY (re #146 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Redacted] ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 162 REPLY (re #145 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 161 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Replies in Support of Motions to Strike filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Replies in Support of Motions to Strike Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Replies in Support of Motions to Strike Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Redacted Version of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Declarations of Prentiss Cox and Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #6 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin, #7 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #8 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 160 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #157 MOTION to Strike #144 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,, DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR DOMINIQUE M. HANSSENS, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION , for Alternative Briefing Schedule filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 159 REPLY (re #137 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 157 MOTION to Strike #144 Opposition/Response to Motion,,,,,, DECLARATION OF PROFESSOR DOMINIQUE M. HANSSENS, PH.D. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/24/2019. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 156 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of #155 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Related document(s) #155 ) (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 155 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Dec. of Professor Hanssens, #4 Redacted Version of LippSmith Decl. ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Dec. of Professor Hanssens, #5 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Dec. of Professor Hanssens, #6 Unredacted Version of LippSmith Decl. ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Dec. of Professor Hanssens)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 154 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #145 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 153 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #146 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Redacted] ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 152 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oppositions to Motions to Strike the Declarations of Jason Bass and Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Strike Bass Dec., #4 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Strike Cox Dec., #5 Redacted Version of LippSmith Dec. ISO Opposition to Motion to Strike Cox Dec., #6 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Strike Bass Dec., #7 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Strike Cox Dec., #8 Unredacted Version of LippSmith Dec. ISO Opposition to Motion to Strike Cox Dec.)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 151 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Set 3 and Request for Production, Set 4 filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ygrene's Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Set 3 and Request for Production, Set 4)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #149 Stipulation for Alternative Briefing Schedule and Modification of Class Certification Schedule. Oppositions due by 10/3/2019; Replies due by 10/17/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #137 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 10/3/2019. Replies due by 10/17/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #137 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 8/23/2019. Replies due by 10/10/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #146 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Redacted], #145 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Responses due by 10/3/2019. Replies due by 10/17/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 149 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #145 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #146 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Redacted] FOR ALTERNATIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. re #139 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Notice of Filing Redacted Versions of Exhibits 5, 6, and 7 to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Motion for Class Certification and Pursuant to the Court's July 10, 2019 Sealing Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 146 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Redacted] filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/6/2019. Replies due by 9/13/2019. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION to Strike #137 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/6/2019. Replies due by 9/13/2019. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 144 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #137 MOTION to Certify Class ) [Redacted] filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #3 Exhibit B to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #4 Exhibit C to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #5 Exhibit D to Levin Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #7 Exhibit F to Levin Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Levin Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Levin Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Levin Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Levin Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Levin Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #14 Exhibit M to Levin Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #16 Exhibit O to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #17 Exhibit P to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #18 Exhibit Q to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #19 Exhibit R to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #20 Exhibit S to Levin Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Levin Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Levin Declaration, #23 Exhibit V to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #24 Exhibit W to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #25 Exhibit X to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #26 Exhibit Y to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #27 Exhibit Z to Levin Declaration [Redacted], #28 Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Redacted])(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Related Documents filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Redacted Version of Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Levin Declaration, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit B to Levin Declaration, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit C to Levin Declaration, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit E to Levin Declaration, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit L to Levin Declaration, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit N to Levin Declaration, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit O to Levin Declaration, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit P to Levin Declaration, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit Q to Levin Declaration, #14 Redacted Version of Exhibit R to Levin Declaration, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit V to Levin Declaration, #16 Redacted Version of Exhibit W to Levin Declaration, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit X to Levin Declaration, #18 Redacted Version of Exhibit Y to Levin Declaration, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit Z to Levin Declaration, #20 Declaration of Professor Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #21 Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #22 Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #23 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Levin Declaration, #25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Levin Declaration, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C to Levin Declaration, #27 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E to Levin Declaration, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit L to Levin Declaration, #29 Unredacted Version of Exhibit N to Levin Declaration, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit O to Levin Declaration, #31 Unredacted Version of Exhibit P to Levin Declaration, #32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Q to Levin Declaration, #33 Unredacted Version of Exhibit R to Levin Declaration, #34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit V to Levin Declaration, #35 Unredacted Version of Exhibit W to Levin Declaration, #36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit X to Levin Declaration, #37 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Y to Levin Declaration, #38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit Z to Levin Declaration, #39 Unredacted Version of the Declaration of Dominique M. Hanssens, Ph.D. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #40 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #41 Unredacted Version of Defendants' Motion to Strike the Declaration of Jason Bass in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/23/2019)
July 31, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley re #137 MOTION to Certify Class of Errata re Exhibit A to the Declaration of Prentiss Cox (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Prentiss Cox including CV)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 7/31/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #140 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Filing 140 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #137 MOTION to Certify Class Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part #136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The court grants the motion to file under seal as to the portions of the Cox and Bass declarations. the court denies the motion as to exhibits 5, 6, and 7 and asks Ygrene to submit appropriately redacted versions of the exhibits that comply with Civil Local Rule 79-5. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 138 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of #136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Class Certification and Related Documents Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Related document(s) #136 ) (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 137 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 7/12/2019. Replies due by 7/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [REDACTED], #3 Declaration of Jason Bass, CPA, CFA in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [REDACTED], #4 Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [REDACTED], #5 Declaration of Jeffrey Kaliel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #6 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
June 28, 2019 Filing 136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Administrative Motion to File Motion for Class Certification and Related Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Redacted Version of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Redacted Version of Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Jason Bass, CPA, CFA in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #6 Redacted Version of Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #7 Unredacted Version of Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #8 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #9 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Jason Bass, CPA, CFA in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #10 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Prentiss Cox in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 6/28/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER regarding discovery disputes and case management (and documenting matters discussed at the 5/23/2019 hearing). (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/23/2019. Expert preliminary disclosure due by 6/21/2019. Court will issue order. Total Time in Court: 32 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jaclyn Anderson and Graham Lippsmith (Phone). Defendants' Attorneys: Frederick Levin and Ali Abugheida. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 133 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of #126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Parties' Joint Letter Brief filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Related document(s) #126 ) (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #131 Stipulation As To Form and Preservation of Objections During Depositions. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 22, 2019 Filing 131 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER As to Form and Preservation of Objections During Depositions filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 5/22/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 130 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #128 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Parties are to make arrangements through CourtCall. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 128 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Further Case Management Conference filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 127 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Parties' Joint Letter Brief filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Joint Letter Brief, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits A-E to JLB, #5 Unredacted Joint Letter Brief, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibits A-E to JLB)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 125 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2019. Depositions to be completed by 5/10/2019. Total Time in Court: 36 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jaclyn Anderson and Graham Lippsmith. Defendants' Attorneys: Frederick Levin and Ali Abugheida. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Order terminating #120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. The court wants joint discovery letters, not separate ones. Lead trial counsel who are in the same area must confer in person (and if they are in different areas, they must talk in person). The parties do not need to resubmit any attachments and can just reference them, but the letter must be joint. That process tends to resolve disputes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 122 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by George W. Woolley. (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 121 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Letter Brief to the Court Concerning Discovery Disputes ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
April 9, 2019 Filing 120 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Letter Brief to the Court Concerning Discovery Disputes filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 4/9/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 119 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 118 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The court has a scheduling conflict and resets the further CMC from 4/18/2019 to 4/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. The parties' joint CMC statement remains due on 4/11/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
March 26, 2019 Filing 117 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 11:00 AM is reset to 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:Further Case Management Conferences set for 04/18/2018 and 5/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated joint case management conference statements due by 4/11/2019 and 5/16/2019.Last day for Plaintiffs to take depositions before Class Certification Motion by 4/19/2019.Opposition to Class Certification by 7/19/2019; Reply to opposition by 8/2/2019.Non-expert discovery completion due by 12/2/2019. Expert disclosures due 1/29/2020; Rebuttal expert disclosures due 2/28/2020.Last hearing date for dispositive motions and/or further case-management conference set for 1/31/2020 at 9:30 AM/11:00 AM. Meet and confer by 3/2/2019.Pretrial filings due 3/13/2019; Oppositions, objections, exhibits, and depo designations due 3/20/2019.Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/31/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 115 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/31/2019. Court to issue scheduling order. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. The court also sets a Further Case Management Conference for 5/23/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Short update to be filed by 5/16/2019. Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Jacklyn Anderson. Defendants' Attorneys: Fredrick Levin and Ali Abugheida. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 114 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 10, 2019, before Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #108 Transcript Order, #110 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2019. (Related documents(s) #108 , #110 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 113 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT re Proposed Joint Case-Management Schedule filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Name (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendants (Paluch, Daniel) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 10, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 109 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/10/2019 9:39:11 AM ]. File Size [ 16488 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:34:21 ]. (courtspeak).
January 10, 2019 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/10/2019 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Discovery Hearing and Further Case Management Conference held on 1/10/2019. The court held a case-management conference, required a meet-and-confer within 7 days, and ordered a further update within 14 days. The court set a further case-management conference for 1/31/2019 at 11:00 a.m.FTR Time: 9:39-10:13. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jaclyn Anderson, Sophia Gold and Graham Lippsmith. Defendants' Attorneys: Frederick Levin and Ali Abugheida. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2019) Modified on 1/10/2019: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor.In the attached order, the court memorializes the process discussed at today's hearing. Assuming that the document production is complete (as discussed at the hearing and in the attached order), the process will result in the parties' proposing a schedule within 14 days. The court sets a further case-management conference for 1/31/2019 at 11:00 a.m. and vacates the other dates in the case in favor of this process. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #103 Administrative Motion. The court sets a case-management conference for 1/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom B and will set a case schedule then. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
December 24, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (The court adds that it is advancing the case-management conference previously set for 1/31/2019 to 1/10/2019. The parties' submissions at ECF Nos. 103 and 104 may serve as their updated case-management statement if the parties want, which will avoid the need to file an updated statement on 1/3/2019.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 104 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #103 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set a Case Schedule ) filed byLt. Joseph J. Galaska, Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Mary J Loudenslager-Smith, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, Grachian L. Smith, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 103 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set a Case Schedule filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. Responses due by 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fredrick S. Levin in Support of Defendants' Motion for Administrative Relief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 102 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/17/2018, before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 4:05 p.m. - 5:11 p.m. = 66 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #100 Transcript Order, #101 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2018. (Related documents(s) #100 , #101 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Discovery Hearing held on 8/17/2018. Defendants are to complete production by Friday, 8/24/2018. Parties will provide the Court with an update regarding their discovery plan and consideration of 30(b)(6) deposition. Parties are directed to notify the Court if more disputes arise.FTR Time: 4:05-5:11. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Jeff Kaliel, Graham Lippsmith.Defendants' Attorneys: Fredrick Levin, Daniel Paluch, Ali Abugheida. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2018) Modified on 8/20/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2018 Filing 98 Amended Discovery Order. The amended order reflects that the seven-day period to complete the production is 8/24/2018, not 8/27/2018. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 97 Discovery Order (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 96 STATUS REPORT - Joint Report on Status of Discovery Dispute by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 95 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: 8/17/2018 DISCOVERY HEARING: The Court has allowed parties to appear by telephone and will circulate a call-in number separately to the parties by email. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re #92 Request for Clarification of Court's Orders and to Continue Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing set for 8/17/2018 04:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/14/2018. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 93 RESPONSE to re #92 Response ( Non Motion ), by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 92 RESPONSE to PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF COURT'S ORDER AND TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY HEARING TO AUGUST 17, 2018 by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order regarding #90 Discovery Letter Brief entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court adds that it appreciates that the parties met in June but thinks that a further attempt to narrow their disputes would be productive now that the parties have reduced their positions to writing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 11, 2018 Discovery Hearing set for 8/16/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court thinks that the current discovery dispute would benefit from a case-management conference. The court sets one for 8/16/2018 at 11:00 a.m. and directs the parties to confer before the hearing for at least two hours in person. The court apologizes for the short notice but has a jury trial the following week and is not sure yet how that week's case-management schedule will work. The court also thinks in-person participation at the hearing is better but recognizes that counsel are not local and thus is amenable to a telephone conference if lead counsel meet before the hearing in person (as they can given their geographic locations) to try to narrow their disputes. The parties really ought to be able to work out a reasonable plan without the court's intervention to get out discovery without derailing the current schedule. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 8/11/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 90 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Exhibit, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certification)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
June 19, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Change of Address by Graham Bruce LippSmith (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re #87 Amending Case Management and Pretrial Order. Plaintiffs to file their motion for class certification by 9/4/2018.Defendants opposition due 10/5/2018. Plaintiffs reply due 10/19/2018. Class Certification Hearing: 11/8/2018. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/19/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 87 Proposed Order Amending Case Management and Pretrial Order by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2018. Motion for Class Certification date is extended by 90 days. Parties will submit proposed scheduling chart.Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Jaclyn Anderson (Phone). Defendants' Attorneys: Fredrick Levin and Daniel Paluch. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Plaintiffs Request to Appear at the Further Case Management Conference by CourtCall. Parties are to make arrangements through CourtCall. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/15/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 84 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO APPEAR AT THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY COURTCALL by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Anderson, Jaclyn) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 83 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TIME: The court is in trial and so moves the CMC from 11:00 a.m. to 2:30 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 82 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER; filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 3/8/2018) Modified on 3/13/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2018 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Mary J Loudenslager-Smith, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Grachian L. Smith re #79 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Order Dismissing Party, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATED ESI DISCOVERY PROTOCOL ORDER. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/08/2018. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 79 Amended ORDER: The attached amended order is identical to the order at ECF No. 78 except it deletes the reference to the separate judgment in the conclusion and attaches the court's January 25, 2018 order. (Attachments: #1 Prior Order)(lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER dismissing Michael G. Pekel's case for his failure to prosecute it. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on February 8, 2018. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 77 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 2/8/2018. Mr. Pekel failed to appear as ordered by the court. Court to issue order.Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Jaclyn Anderson (Phone). Defendants' Attorney: Daniel Paluch (Phone). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley re #73 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Return of Service)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Goren Gold (Gold, Sophia) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 74 STIPULATION ESI Discovery Protocol filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting #69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. In the attached order, the court grants the motion to withdraw. The court also orders Mr. Pekel to appear in person or though counsel at 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 15th Floor, Courtroom C, San Francisco, California, on February 8, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. to show cause why his case should not be dismissed based on his failure to prosecute it. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 18, 2018 Filing 72 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/18/2018. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/8/2018 at 11:00 AM. Plaintiff Michael G. Pekel is ordered to appear in person. Court permits counsel to appear telephonically. Counsel to make arrangements through CourtCall. FTR Time: 9:37-9:39. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Jaclyn Anderson. Defendants' Attorney: Daniel Paluch. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/18/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 71 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 70 Proposed Order re #69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Michael G. Pekel by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Michael G. Pekel filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 1/23/2018. Replies due by 1/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Manuel S. Hiraldo)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
January 8, 2018 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The court noticed that a further CMC was wrongly set on a Wednesday, 3/14/2018, and thus changes that date to Thursday, 3/15/2018, at 11:00 a.m. This does not affect the CMC now set for 1/18/2018 at 9:30 a.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
December 29, 2017 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT TIME: Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM is reset to 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2017)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #64 Tycko & Zavareei LLP's Request to Withdraw as counsel of record. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 Filing 64 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tycko & Zavareei LLP filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 1/2/2018. Replies due by 1/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Persinger, Annick) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing: Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 63 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (HEARING WAS NOT REPORTED/RECORDED) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/14/17 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Paluch, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2017) Modified on 12/18/2017 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:Amended pleadings due by 2/2/2018. Updated joint case management conference statement due by 3/7/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.Non-expert discovery completion due by 11/2/2018. Expert disclosures due 1/29/2019; Rebuttal expert disclosures due 2/28/2019.Last hearing date for dispositive motions and/or further case-management conference set for 1/31/2019 at 9:30 AM/11:00 AM. Meet and confer by 3/4/2019.Pretrial filings due 3/14/2019; Oppositions, objections, exhibits, and depo designations due 3/21/2019.Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 4/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Jury Trial set for 4/15/2019 - 5/3/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/14/2017. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2017. Scheduling order to issue. Tycko & Zavareei, LLP will be withdrawing as counsel of record. Motion to Withdraw to be filed within 7 days. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2018. Total Time in Court: 28 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiffs' Attorney: Graham Lippsmith. Defendants' Attorneys: Fredrick Levin and Daniel Paluch. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 60 Transcript of Digital Audio Recording of Proceedings held on 11/2/2017, before Judge Laurel Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #58 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2018. (Related documents(s) #58 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 59 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/02/17 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Paluch, Daniel) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
November 27, 2017 Filing 57 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (SECOND) byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #55 Stipulated Protective Order. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Lt. Joseph J. Galaska, Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Mary J Loudenslager-Smith, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, Grachian L. Smith, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attestation, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Anderson, Jaclyn) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #53 Stipulated Request Dismissing Plaintiffs Smiths' Claims with Prejudice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 7, 2017 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS SMITHS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE filed by Mary J Loudenslager-Smith, Grachian L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #45 Motion to Dismiss.In the attached order, the court grants the motion to dismiss the Smiths' claims without prejudice and with leave to file an amended complaint by November 27, 2017. The court denies the motion to dismiss the tortious-interference claim. The disputed facts are better resolved on summary judgment. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/4/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2017 re #45 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Matter is taken under submission. Court will issue order.FTR Time: 10:56-11:24. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Annick Persinger and Graham Lippsmith. Defendants' Attorneys: Daniel Paluch and Fredrick Levin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2017) Modified on 12/7/2017: Matter transcribed by Lydia Zinn (Zinn Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2017 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The court advances the 12/21/2017 initial case-management conference to 12/14/2017 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 49 REPLY (re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 2, 2017 Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byAnthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Mary J Loudenslager-Smith, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, Grachian L. Smith, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 24, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 10/2/2017. Replies due by 10/19/2017. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2017)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #46 Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss.Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2017. Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Responses due by 10/2/2017. Replies due by 10/19/2017. Motion Hearing reset for 11/2/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) Modified on 9/24/2017 (tmiS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2017 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Mary J Loudenslager-Smith, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, Grachian L. Smith, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 9/22/2017. Replies due by 9/29/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Strothmann, #2 Proposed Order)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against All Defendants. Filed byTammy S. Woolley, Felicia Marcey, Alejandro Marcey, George W. Woolley, Anthony Look, Jr, Grachian L. Smith, Kimberly Look, Michael G. Pekel, Mary Jane Smith. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 15, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Lt. Joseph J. Galaska (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE: Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Given that the amended complaint in this case is due on 8/25/2017, the Court hereby continues the Initial Case Management Conference to 10/19/2017, 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA, before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part #34 Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint must be filed within 30 days of this order. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING: The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Thursday, July 13, 2017, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Jaclyn Goren (Goren, Sophia) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 38 REPLY (re #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byYgrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byLt. Joseph J. Galaska, Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, Grachian L. Smith, Mary Jane Smith, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 36 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 6/6/2017 with Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 6, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali M Abugheida (Abugheida, Ali) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 6/20/2017. Replies due by 6/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting Time of Case Management Conference: The court has a trial and thus resets the time of the CMC on Thursday, 6/8/2017, from 11:00 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.The court's practice is to have the initial case-management conference after the pleadings are settled and thus continues the initial case-management conference to a date that should be after the hearing date for the defendant's contemplated motion to dismiss. The parties may adjust the date by stipulation. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Lt. Joseph J. Galaska, Anthony Look, Jr, Kimberly Look, Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Michael G. Pekel, Grachian L. Smith, Mary Jane Smith, George W. Woolley, Tammy S. Woolley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 30 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on June 6, 2017 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 26 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 18, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Annick Marie Persinger (Persinger, Annick) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants. Filed byFelicia Marcey, Alejandro Marcey, Grachian L. Smith, Mary Jane Smith, Lt. Joseph J. Galaska, Michael G. Pekel, Anthony Look, Jr, George W. Woolley, Kimberly Look, Tammy S. Woolley. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order finding as moot #19 Motion to Dismiss entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is an administrative termination to remove the matter from calendar.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order granting #21 Stipulation entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The court grants the parties' stipulated request under L.R. 6-2 for an order changing the time to amend the pleadings. The plaintiffs must file their amended pleading by May 16, 2017, and the defendants have 21 days from the date of that filing to file their responsive pleading. The plaintiffs' filing of an amended complaint will moot the pending motion to dismiss. The court thus will terminate the pending motion (which will remove the case from calendar). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 2, 2017 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE REQUEST PURSUANT TO L.R. 6-2 FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME TO AMEND PLEADING filed by Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Grachian L. Smith, Mary Jane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dec. of Graham B. LippSmith, #2 Proposed Order)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
April 21, 2017 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ygrene Holdings Florida LLC for Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 5/2/2017. Replies due by 5/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Strothmann, #2 Proposed Order)(Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 13, 2017 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc... (Paluch, Daniel) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 4/13/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
March 29, 2017 Filing 16 STIPULATION extending time to answer or respond to Complaint filed by Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 29, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Raphael Paluch (Paluch, Daniel) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 29, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Fredrick Stuart Levin (Levin, Fredrick) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Grachian L. Smith, Mary Jane Smith.. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 15, 2017 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Grachian L. Smith, Mary Jane Smith re #7 Summons Issued, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
March 15, 2017 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alejandro Marcey, Felicia Marcey, Grachian L. Smith, Mary Jane Smith re #7 Summons Issued, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Complaint, on Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/15/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler; granting #4 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Louise Anderson as counsel for Plaintiffs (Anderson, Jaclyn) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel (Kaliel, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC, Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2017. Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/24/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Manuel S. Hiraldo ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11221271.) filed by ALEJANDRO MARCEY, FELICIA MARCEY, GRACHIAN L. SMITH, MARY JANE SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hiraldo, Manuel) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by ALEJANDRO MARCEY, FELICIA MARCEY, GRACHIAN L. SMITH, MARY JANE SMITH (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11220562.). Filed byGRACHIAN L. SMITH, FELICIA MARCEY, ALEJANDRO MARCEY, MARY JANE SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LippSmith, Graham) (Filed on 3/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woolley et al v. Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Fredrick Stuart Levin
Represented By: Ali M Abugheida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ygrene Energy Fund Florida, LLC
Represented By: Fredrick Stuart Levin
Represented By: Ali M Abugheida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Look, Jr.
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary J Loudenslager-Smith
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lt. Joseph J. Galaska
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W. Woolley
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G. Pekel
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Look
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy S. Woolley
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grachian L. Smith
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Marcey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Marcey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Jeffrey Douglas Kaliel
Represented By: Graham Bruce LippSmith
Represented By: Kenneth S. Kasdan
Represented By: Sophia Goren Gold
Represented By: Jaclyn Louise Anderson
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?