Duran v. Sephora USA Inc

Plaintiff: Jessica Duran
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01261
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING STATE LAW CLAIMS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/18/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
August 11, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 35 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED MATTERS by Judge William H. Orrick. 32 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Sephora may, and Duran shall, submit additional briefing on the issue of whether I should decli ne to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Duran's state law claims in accordance with the schedule above. The hearing set for August 16, 2017 is CONTINUED to September 20, 2017 to consider whether supplemental jurisdiction is appropriate. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
July 5, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING DEADLINES granting 33 STIPULATION - Deadline re 32 MOTION to Dismiss reset. Response due by 7/14/2017. Reply due by 7/24/2017. (Hearing remains set for August 16, 2017.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/05/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. Sephora USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Duran
Represented By: Alejandro Pedro Gutierrez
Represented By: Brian Daniel Hefelfinger
Represented By: Daniel Jay Palay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sephora USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Ralston Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?