Brown v. Baughman

Petitioner: Kenny M. Brown
Respondent: David Baughman
Case Number: 3:2017cv01409
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE. ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Seventh Amended Petition due by 12/11/2017. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/25/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
August 23, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING re 25 Amended Petition /Motion to Reopen filed by Kenny M. Brown. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/23/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
July 25, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/25/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
May 2, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. DENYING as insufficient Petitioner's IFP Applications 2 and 7 and DENYING without prejudice 9 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/2/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenny M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?