Yazmin Elias Obregon v. Jefferson B. Sessions III et al

Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, John F Kelly, David W. Jennings and David O. Livingston
Petitioner: Yazmin Liliana Elias Obregon
Case Number: 3:2017cv01463
Filed: March 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 8:1105
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 14, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 25 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION by Hon. William H. Orrick. The Court finds the petitioner's claims to be moot. Petitioner is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why her claims should not be dismissed and this case administratively closed. Petitioner may file a brief of no more than 10 pages within 14 days of this Order, explaining why this case should not be closed. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
April 20, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 9 Motion for TRO. The Court orders that petitioner's next Rodriguez bond hearing be completed prior to May 15, 2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
March 27, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 STIPULATION to continue deadlines and hearing re 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Response due by 3/30/2017 at 11:59 a.m. Reply due by 4/3/2017 at 9:00 a.m. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/24/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yazmin Elias Obregon v. Jefferson B. Sessions III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yazmin Liliana Elias Obregon
Represented By: Etan Z Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions
Represented By: Neill Tai Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Kelly
Represented By: Neill Tai Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Jennings
Represented By: Neill Tai Tseng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David O. Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?