Thrash et al v. Cirrus Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Thrash and Chez Thrash
Defendant: Cirrus Enterprises, LLC, The Boeing Company, Lockheed Martin Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Honeywell International Inc., Rohr, Inc. and Henkel Corporation, individually and as s-i-i to DEXTER CORP., DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv01501
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER GRANTING FOR DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 3, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 251 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE BOEING COMPANY filed by The Boeing Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 18, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 249 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Dismissal of United Technologies Corporation filed by Joseph Thrash, Chez Thrash. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 13, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 245 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Dismissal of Lockheed filed by Joseph Thrash, Chez Thrash. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 13, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ROHR, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 147 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 183 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 202 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re. Dismissal of Defendant Henkel Corporation filed by Joseph Thrash. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DEPOSITIONS OF EXPERT WITNESSES filed by The Boeing Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 15, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Rohr, Inc.'s 30(b)(6) witness filed by Rohr, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 13, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT CIRRUS ENTERPRISES LLC, filed by Cirrus Enterprises, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 1, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 99 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by The Boeing Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding United Technologies Corporation's deposition filed by United Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 12, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY DEADLINES filed by The Boeing Company. Deadline for completion of non-expert discovery 2/7/2018. Exchange of initial expert reports 2/12/2018. Exchange of rebuttal expert reports 2/21/2018. Deadline for completion of expert discovery 3/7/2018. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Protective Order Re Export-Controlled and Confidential / Proprietary Documents and Information filed by United Technologies Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 26 Motion to Remand. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SERVICE VIA FILE & SERVE XPRESS filed by The Boeing Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 30, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thrash et al v. Cirrus Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirrus Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Dustin Clark Beckley
Represented By: Brent Marshall Karren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Brian Thomas Clark
Represented By: Guy P. Glazier
Represented By: Laura Patricia Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Ferlin Peregrino Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Melissa Rose Badgett
Represented By: Megan Feeney Clark
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: David T. Biderman
Represented By: Bo W. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohr, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Glaspy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henkel Corporation, individually and as s-i-i to DEXTER CORP., DEXTER HYSOL AEROSPACE LLC
Represented By: Allison Elizabeth Mullings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Thrash
Represented By: Benno Behnam Ashrafi
Represented By: Robert Allen Green
Represented By: Tyler Robert Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chez Thrash
Represented By: Benno Behnam Ashrafi
Represented By: Robert Allen Green
Represented By: Tyler Robert Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?