Blanchard et al v. Fluent, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Mira Blanchard, Ryan Cooper, Mark Davis, Chandra Greenberg, James Jobe, Debra Kottong, Ogen Lama, Maria Marquez, Vanessa Powers and Gail Taylor
Defendant: Fluent, Inc., Reward Zone USA LLC, Rewardsflow LLC, American Prize Center LLC, Mohit Singla and Sauphtware, Inc. d/b/a/ Panda Mail
Case Number: 3:2017cv01551
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR COSTS. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 2, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES. The hearing scheduled for June 9, 2017 is vacated. The case management conference scheduled for June 23, 2017 is vacated. The parties are relieved of their obligation to comply with the ADR deadlines until resolution of the jurisdictional issue. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/02/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
May 25, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT FLUENT, LLC TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/25/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 12, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FILED MAY 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/12/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 11, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATIONS; EXTENDING FILING DEADLINES AND CONTINUING HEARING DATE. The deadline for Fluent to file its responses to plaintiffs' motion and the Court's order to show cause is extended to May 18, 2017. The deadline for plaintiffs' replies is extended to May 25, 2017. The hearing is continued to June 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/11/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
April 14, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING RESPONSE DATE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE/MOTION TO REMAND AND CONTINUING HEARING TO JUNE 2, 2017. Fluent's opposition shall be filed no later than May 8, 2017, and plaintiffs' reply, if any, shall be filed no later than May 15, 2017. The hearing on plaintiffs' motion to remand is continued from May 12, 2017, to June 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/14/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 11, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFFS' DEADLINE TO RESPONSE TO FLUENT'S ANSWER. Plaintiffs' deadline to file a Rule 12(e) and/or Rule 12(f) Motion as to Fluent's answer is continued to 21 days after the Court rules on federal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/11/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 4, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT FLUENT, LLC TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED; CONTINUING HEARING ON SAUPHTWARE, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Fluent LLC is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than April 17, 2017, why the a ction should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If plaintiffs wish to file a reply to Fluent's response, plaintiffs shall do so no later than April 24, 2017. The May 5, 2017, hearing on defendant Saughtware, Inc.'s motion to dismiss is vacated, and will be reset, as appropriate, following the Court's determination as to subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 4, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard et al v. Fluent, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mira Blanchard
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Cooper
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Davis
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandra Greenberg
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jobe
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kottong
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ogen Lama
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Marquez
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Powers
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Taylor
Represented By: Daniel L. Balsam
Represented By: Jacob N Harker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluent, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reward Zone USA LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rewardsflow LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Prize Center LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohit Singla
Represented By: Andrew D. Castricone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sauphtware, Inc. d/b/a/ Panda Mail
Represented By: Damian M Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?