Beland v. Ortiz

Plaintiff: Victoria Beland
Defendant: Napoleon Ortiz and JP Morgan Chase Manhattan Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01816
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 41 Stipulation Change Name of Trust. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 28, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 37 Stipulation for Plaintiff to Change Name for Defendant JPMorgan Manhattan Bank in First Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 19, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 5, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Stipulation Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(a) to Continue the Deadline for Circulating Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Scheduled for September 1, 2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
July 31, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference Scheduled For August 1, 2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 14, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beland v. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napoleon Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Manhattan Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Beland
Represented By: Daniel Denis Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?