Greenberg v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Todd Greenberg
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2017cv01862
Filed: April 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 105 Regarding Rescheduling Hearing On Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/18/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 84 Class Certification Schedule. Motion Hearing previously set for 5/9/2019 has been continued to 7/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/20/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 82 Class Certification Schedule. Motion Hearing previously set for 1/24/2019 has been rescheduled to 5/9/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/8/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATIOPN RE 56 Regarding Filing Of Second Amended Complaint And Extending Class Certification Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/13/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 17-cv-3193-VC. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 9/6/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Hearing On Defendants Motion To Dismiss. Motion Hearing reset for 8/31/2017, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 07/31/2017. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenberg v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Greenberg
Represented By: Carrie Ann Laliberte
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?