Juicero, Inc. v. iTaste Co. et al

Plaintiff: Juicero, Inc.
Defendant: iTaste Co., Froothie USA LLC, Xiuxing "Leo" Chen and iTaste Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2017cv01921
Filed: April 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 44 , 55 , 60 MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/28/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 5, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COURT-ORDERED SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/5/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 30, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 35 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/30/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juicero, Inc. v. iTaste Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juicero, Inc.
Represented By: Brett J. Arnold
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Joseph Milowic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iTaste Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Froothie USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiuxing "Leo" Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iTaste Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?