Simpson v. Carruthers

Plaintiff: Chauncey Simpson
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers
Case Number: 3:2017cv02066
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/29/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 14, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 26 Joint Motion to Allow Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
August 23, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 22 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
July 12, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Motion to Continue the August 1, 2017 Case Management Conference date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chauncey Simpson
Represented By: Crosby Scott Connolly
Represented By: Robert L. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers
Represented By: Dennis Scott Carruthers
Represented By: John Robert Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?