Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. v. Alibaba.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.
Defendant: Alibaba.com, Inc, Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc., eBay Inc. and Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd.
Intervenor: Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
Not Classified By Court: William E Thomson, Jr. and David A Randall
Case Number: 3:2017cv02177
Filed: April 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND RELATED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 13, 2020 Filing 180 Transcript of At&T Teleconference Proceedings held on 8-6-2020, before Judge William H. alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #179 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2020. (Related documents(s) #179 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 6, 2020 before Judge William Alsup by Alibaba.com, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sun, Nathan) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 178 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2020. re (132 in 3:17-cv-02178-WHA) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by eBay, Inc., (163 in 3:17-cv-02177-WHA) MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., (109 in 3:17-cv-02435-WHA) MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba Cloud Computing, Ltd., Nimbus Development, Inc. Total Time in Court: 1:02. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE by David A Randall, William E Thomson, Jr re #175 Order, of GEMSA's Response to Order re Plaintiff's Failure to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GEMSA email)(Murphy, James) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 176 Declaration of Mark A. Cantor, William P. Ramey, III and Richard N. Laminack in Support of #175 Order, filed byDavid A Randall, William E Thomson, Jr. (Related document(s) #175 ) (Murphy, James) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/28/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 23, 2020 Filing 174 REPLY (re #171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exs 34a, 34b, and 34c to The Attorneys' Combined Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Entitlement to Attorneys' Fees and Costs ) filed byAlibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ramos Decl ISO Reply ISO Fees Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Declaration B. Weed Decl ISO Reply ISO Fees Motion, #13 Exhibit A)(Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 173 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Sealed Reply ISO Fees Motion)(Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 172 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #163 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exs 34a, 34b, and 34c to The Attorneys' Combined Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Entitlement to Attorneys' Fees and Costs ) filed byDavid A Randall, William E Thomson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ramey Decl., #2 Exhibit 25 - Amended docket control order, #3 Exhibit 26 - Unopposed docket control order, #4 Exhibit 27 - Memorandum opinion and order, #5 Exhibit 28 - Rosenberg Expert Report re Infringement, #6 Exhibit 28a - Ex P1 to Rosenberg Report, #7 Exhibit 28b - Ex P2 to Rosenberg Report, #8 Exhibit 29 - Rosenberg Supp Report re Validity, #9 Exhibit 30 - Patent Owner's Preliminary Response IPR2016-01828, #10 Exhibit 31 - Patent Owner's Response to IPR 2016-01828, #11 Exhibit 32 - GEMSA Supp Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, #12 Exhibit 33 - Rosenberg Expert Report re Infringement ebay, #13 Exhibit 34 - Rosenberg Supp Infringement Report ebay, #14 Exhibit 34a - Redacted, #15 Exhibit 34b - Redacted, #16 Exhibit 34c - Redacted, #17 Declaration Laminack Decl, #18 Exhibit 35 - Letter from Mediator, #19 Declaration Cantor Decl, #20 Exhibit 36 - Emails between Cantor and Weed, #21 Exhibit 37 - PTAB decision denying GEMSA motion to terminate IPRs, #22 Exhibit 38 - Defendants' Petition for IPR2016-01828, #23 Exhibit 39 - GEMSA Response, #24 Exhibit 40 - Defendants' Reply, #25 Exhibit 41 - Defendants' Petition for IPR2016-01829, #26 Exhibit 42 - GEMSA Response, #27 Exhibit 43 - Defendants' Reply, #28 Exhibit 44 - PTAB decision denying GEMSA's request to renew motion, #29 Exhibit 45 - GEMSA Federal Circuit opening appeal brief, #30 Exhibit 46 - Defendants' Federal Circuit Response Brief, #31 Exhibit 47 - GEMSA Federal Circuit reply brief, #32 Exhibit 48 - PTAB decision denying Petitioner's motion to exclude Rafizadeh)(Murphy, James) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 171 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exs 34a, 34b, and 34c to The Attorneys' Combined Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Entitlement to Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by David A Randall, William E Thomson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ramey Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 34 a, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex 34a, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 34b, #6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex 34b, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex 34c, #8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex 34c)(Murphy, James) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED INCREASE OF PAGE LIMITS (re Dkt. No. 116 in No. C 17-02435). Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/30/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
June 2, 2020 Filing 169 CLERK'S NOTICE RE 8/6/2020 HEARING: Telephonic Motion Hearing re (163 in 3:17-cv-02177-WHA) MOTION for Attorney Fees , (132 in 3:17-cv-02178-WHA) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs, (109 in 3:17-cv-02435-WHA) MOTION for Attorney Fees set for 8/6/2020 08:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. The Court circulates the following dial-in information to allow the equivalent of a public hearing:Teleconference Number: 888-684-8852Access Code: 3707514Please allow adequate time to check-in with the courtroom deputy by connecting to the teleconference line 10 minutes prior to the scheduled start time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW; GRANTING IN PART EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 167 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #163 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2020 Filing 166 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. Responses due by 6/11/2020. Replies due by 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomson, William) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 165 UNOPPOSED Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by David A Randall, William E Thomson, Jr. Responses due by 6/10/2020. Replies due by 6/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Mark A. Cantor, #3 Exhibit A - Email)(Murphy, James) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2020 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by James Anthony Murphy (Murphy, James) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 163 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. Responses due by 6/2/2020. Replies due by 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Weed, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Declaration of Roger Shang, #24 Declaration of Carey Ramos, #25 Exhibit A, #26 Exhibit A-1, #27 Exhibit B, #28 Exhibit B-1, #29 Exhibit C, #30 Exhibit D, #31 Exhibit E-1, #32 Exhibit E-2, #33 Exhibit F, #34 Exhibit G, #35 Exhibit G-1, #36 Exhibit H, #37 Exhibit I-1, #38 Exhibit I-2, #39 Exhibit I-3, #40 Exhibit J, #41 Exhibit K, #42 Exhibit L, #43 Exhibit M, #44 Exhibit N, #45 Exhibit O, #46 Exhibit P, #47 Exhibit Q, #48 Exhibit R, #49 Exhibit S, #50 Exhibit T, #51 Exhibit U, #52 Exhibit V, #53 Exhibit W, #54 Exhibit X, #55 Exhibit Y, #56 Exhibit Z, #57 Exhibit AA, #58 Exhibit BB, #59 Exhibit CC, #60 Exhibit DD, #61 Exhibit EE, #62 Exhibit FF, #63 Exhibit GG)(Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 162 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carey Ramos, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Weed, #3 Proposed Order Granting, #4 Redacted Defs' Motion for Entitlement to Attorney's Fees and Costs, #5 Unredacted Defs' Motion for Entitlement to Attorney's Fees and Costs, #6 Declaration Benjamin Weed Unredacted, #7 Declaration Benjamin Weed Redacted, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 6 Redacted, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 8 Redacted, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Declaration of Roger Shang, #19 Declaration of Roger Shang Redacted, #20 Declaration of Carey Ramos, #21 Declaration of Carey Ramos Redacted, #22 Exhibit G-1, #23 Exhibit I-1, #24 Exhibit I-2, #25 Exhibit I-3, #26 Exhibit J, #27 Exhibit K, #28 Exhibit L, #29 Exhibit M, #30 Exhibit N, #31 Exhibit T, #32 Exhibit U, #33 Exhibit V, #34 Exhibit W, #35 Exhibit X)(Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER RE POTENTIAL MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/5/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 160 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/5/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 159 JOINT Response to Order to Show Cause by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/4/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED. SIGNED BY JUDGE ALSUP. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 157 JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Keith Mfg. Co. v. Butterfield, #2 Exhibit B - Markman Order 2:16-cv-00095, #3 Exhibit C - Hopkins Mfg. Corp. v. Cequent Performance Prods.)(Thomson, William) (Filed on 4/9/2020) Modified on 4/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by David Eiseman, IV (Eiseman, David) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/24/2020. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 154 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 3/23/2020) Modified on 3/24/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2019 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT Joint by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. and eBay Inc. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 12/13/2019) Modified on 12/13/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/24/2019. Status Report due by 12/13/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 151 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd., eBay Inc., Alibaba.com, Inc., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd. and Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/21/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/25/2019. Status Report due by 11/22/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 149 STATUS REPORT Joint by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
June 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/2/2019. Status Report due by 9/6/2019. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 147 STATUS REPORT Joint by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd., eBay Inc., Alibaba.com, Inc., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd. and Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 5/31/2019) Modified on 5/31/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/6/2018. Status Report due by 5/31/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 145 STATUS REPORT Joint by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 400 Patent Rehearing Decision, #2 Exhibit B - 677 Patent Rehearing Decision)(Thomson, William) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 144 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion NOTICE TO WITHDRAW INTERVENOR RAMEY & SCHWALLER, LLPS MOTION TO INTERVENE (Ramey, William) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 143 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #131 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE STIPULATION TO CHANGE HEARING DATE AND (PROPOSED) ORDER filed by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP. (Ramey, William) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER DENYING #141 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE MOTION HEARING by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 141 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #131 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE STIPULATION TO CHANGE HEARING DATE AND (PROPOSED) ORDER filed by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP. (Ramey, William) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 140 Declaration of William E. Thomson, Jr. in Support of #139 Opposition/Response to Motion REVISED -- CLEAN version filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Order of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Verified Original Answer)(Related document(s) #139 ) (Thomson, William) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 139 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #131 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE ) REVISED -- CLEAN version filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 138 Declaration of William E. Thomson, Jr. in Support of #137 Opposition/Response to Motion REVISED -- REDLINED filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B Order of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - Verified Original Answer)(Related document(s) #137 ) (Thomson, William) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 137 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #131 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE ) REVISED -- REDLINED filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 136 REPLY (re #131 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE ) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE filed byRamey & Schwaller, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of William P. Ramey III, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ramey, William) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 15, 2018 Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup re #131 Motion to Intervene (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 15, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing re #131 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE Motion Hearing set back to original date of 6/7/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 135 Declaration of William E. Thomson, Jr. in Support of #134 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Petition, Demand for Jury Trial and Requests for Disclosure filed by GEMSA against Ramey & Schwaller, #2 Exhibit B - Verified Original Answer, Counterclaim and Third-Party Petition by The Document Group against Ramey & Schwaller)(Related document(s) #134 ) (Thomson, William) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 134 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #131 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE ) filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/30/2018. Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 132 STATUS REPORT by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2018 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 5/8/2018. Replies due by 5/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of William P. Ramey III)(Ramey, William) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/12/2018. Status Report due by 5/4/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 129 ERRONEOUSLY FILED, SEE DKT 128 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by eBay Inc.. (Lo, Audrey) (Filed on 2/5/2018) Modified on 2/5/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/5/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2018 Filing 128 STATUS REPORT by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 127 ERRONEOUSLY FILED, SEE DKT 128 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by eBay Inc.. (Lo, Audrey) (Filed on 2/5/2018) Modified on 2/5/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/5/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/5/2018 (sxbS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2018 Filing 126 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey S. Gerchick (Gerchick, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING #105 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING #103 PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by David Allen Randall for Plaintiff, Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. (Randall, David) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Thomson, Jr for Plaintiff, Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 121 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/24/17, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (91 in 3:17-cv-02178-WHA) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/19/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2017. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 28, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. re #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Proof of Notice for Motions to Withdraw (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ramey Dec, #2 Exhibit a, #3 Exhibit a1, #4 Exhibit a2, #5 Exhibit a3, #6 Exhibit b, #7 Exhibit b1, #8 Exhibit b2, #9 Exhibit b3, #10 Exhibit c, #11 Exhibit d, #12 Exhibit e, #13 Exhibit e1, #14 Exhibit e2, #15 Exhibit f, #16 Exhibit f1, #17 Exhibit g, #18 Exhibit h, #19 Exhibit h1, #20 Exhibit i)(Ramey, William) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/24/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William Alsup: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2017 re (71 in 3:17-cv-02178-WHA) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd., (66 in 3:17-cv-02435-WHA) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd., (103 in 3:17-cv-02177-WHA) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. Motions Taken Under Submission.Total Time in Court 20 minutes. Court Reporter Name Kathy Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney William Ramey; John Thomas. Defendant Attorney Carey Ramos; Benjamin Weed. This is a text-only Minute Entry (dl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2017)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STATUS REPORT ORDER (re #116 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/22/2017. Status Report due by 2/5/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 116 STATUS REPORT (Jointly by all parties) by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Thomas, John) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON #103 PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW (granting #114 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/31/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 114 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Thomas, John) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 113 Declaration of William B. Ramey in Support of 111 Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, Clerk's Notice,,, Terminate Hearings,, #112 Stipulation, #110 Notice (Other) (Attestation) filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 111 , #112 , #110 ) (Thomas, John) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 21, 2017 Filing 112 STIPULATION re #110 Notice (Other) (Change Hearing Date) filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Thomas, John) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 111 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Motion Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (103 in 3:17-cv-02177-WHA) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (71 in 3:17-cv-02178-WHA) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (66 in 3:17-cv-02435-WHA) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. **Plaintiff's Re-Notice of Motion filed 7/19/2017 is not in compliance with Local Rule 7-7b. The hearing on the Motion to Withdraw remains set for 8/3/2017 per the Re-Notice filed 6/15/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 19, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. re #104 Renotice motion hearing, #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff (Thomas, John) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 109 REPLY (re #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff ) filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thomas, John) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 108 Declaration of Carey R. Ramos in Support of #106 Opposition/Response to Motion, CORRECTION OF DOCKET #107 filed byAlibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W)(Related document(s) #106 ) (Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 107 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. SEE DOCUMENT #108 . *** Declaration of Carey R. Ramos in Support of #106 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byAlibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W)(Related document(s) #106 ) (Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 6/30/2017) Modified on 6/30/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2017 Filing 106 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff ) Defendants Response in Opposition to William P. Ramsey, III and John Thomas's Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff filed byAlibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 105 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Under Seal Portions of the Defendants' Opposition and Supporting Declartation of Carey R. Ramos filed by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. Responses due by 7/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Redacted Response, #5 Unredacted Response, #6 Redacted Declaration, #7 Unredacted Declartation, #8 Redacted Ex A, #9 Unredactded Ex A, #10 Redacted Ex B, #11 UnRedacted Ex B, #12 Redacted Ex C, #13 Unredacted Ex C, #14 Redacted Ex D, #15 Unredacted Ex D-1, #16 Unredacted Ex D-2, #17 Redacted Ex E, #18 Unredacted Ex E-1, #19 Unredacted Ex E-2, #20 Redacted Ex F, #21 Unredacted Ex F, #22 Redacted Ex G, #23 Unredacted Ex G, #24 Redacted Ex H, #25 Unredacted Ex H, #26 Redacted Ex I, #27 Unredacted Ex I, #28 Redacted Ex J, #29 Unredacted Ex J, #30 Redacted Ex K, #31 Unredacted Ex K, #32 Redacted Ex L, #33 Unredacted Ex L-1, #34 Unredacted Ex L-2, #35 Unredacted Ex L-3, #36 Redacted Ex M, #37 Unredacted Ex M, #38 Redacted Ex N, #39 Unredacted Ex N, #40 Redacted Ex O, #41 Unredacted Ex O, #42 Redacted Ex P, #43 Unredacted Ex P, #44 Redacted Ex Q, #45 Unredacted Ex Q, #46 Redacted Ex R, #47 Unredacted Ex R, #48 Redacted Ex S, #49 Unredacted Ex S, #50 Redacted Ex T, #51 Unredacted Ex T, #52 Redacted Ex U, #53 Unredacted Ex U, #54 Redacted Ex V, #55 Unredacted Ex V, #56 Redacted Ex W, #57 Unredacted Ex W)(Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 16, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re #104 Renotice motion hearing, #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 104 Renotice motion hearing re #103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed byGlobal Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Related document(s) #103 ) (Thomas, John) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
June 15, 2017 Filing 103 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Opposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 6/29/2017. Replies due by 7/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, John) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
May 17, 2017 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CMC SET FOR 7/20/2017 re #101 Order Staying Proceedings. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW (pursuant to #98 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/2017. Status Report due by 8/15/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 9, 2017 Filing 100 RELATED CASE ORDER (granting #97 ) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
May 4, 2017 Filing 99 Proposed Order re #97 Amended MOTION to Relate Case Re: #82 Admin Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/4/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Stay Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 97 Amended MOTION to Relate Case Re: #82 Admin Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 filed by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING #95 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY WILLIAM RAMEY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
May 2, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11358953.) filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Thomas, John) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
May 2, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by John Bryant Thomas (Thomas, John) (Filed on 5/2/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 93 Joinder in Alibabas Administrative Mtn to Consider whether Cases Should Be Related filed by eBay Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sinclair, Bryan) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 5/2/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 Filing 92 STIPULATION Re Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by eBay Inc.. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 91 ***PLEASE DISREGARD- FILED IN ERROR*** Renotice motion hearing of Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pusuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed byeBay Inc.. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 4/28/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 Filing 90 ***PLEASE DISREGARD- FILED IN ERROR*** Renotice motion hearing of Motion to Strike Expert Infringement Reports filed byeBay Inc.. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 4/28/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan N Sun (Sun, Nathan) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #85 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRETT WATKINS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING #84 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JEFFREY GERCHICK PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING #83 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CAREY RAMOS PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) Brett Watkins ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11341137.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/25/2017 filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Watkins, Brett) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) Jeff Gerchick ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11341420.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/25/2017 filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Gerchick, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 26, 2017 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Corrected) Carey Ramos ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11341093.) Filing fee previously paid on 4/25/2017 filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 82 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kash, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING #78 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING #77 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING #76 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 78 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeff Gerchick ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11341420.) filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Gerchick, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 77 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brett Watkins ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11341137.) filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Watkins, Brett) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 76 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Carey Ramos ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11341093.) filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Ramos, Carey) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 75 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(alsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 74 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:15-cv-01702. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 18, 2017 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (nkl, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/24/2017. (nkl, )
March 24, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 71, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
March 23, 2017 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
March 23, 2017 Filing 71 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #68 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) Modified on 3/24/2017 (nkl, ).
March 17, 2017 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Brett)
March 13, 2017 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2017 re #34 MOTION to Dismiss The Third Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer filed by Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc., #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett N. Watkins, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
March 8, 2017 Filing 67 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #66 Notice of Supplemental Evidence in Support of the Alibaba.com Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Mann, James)
March 8, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc. of Supplemental Evidence in Support of Alibaba.com Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer filed as Dkt. 34 in Case No. 2:16-cv-00095, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Mann, James)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Correct the Courts February 8, 2017 Notice of Hearing on Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/8/2017. (nkl, )
March 7, 2017 Filing 64 RESPONSE (Surreply) to Motion to Strike GEMSA'S Final Infringement Contentions (filed in 2:16-cv-0095)-Doc. No. 239) filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Ramey, William)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER withdrawing #43 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting #57 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/7/2017. (nkl, )
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #59 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/7/2017. (nkl, )
March 7, 2017 Filing 61 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Certificate of authority to seal): #60 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,. (Ramey, William)
March 6, 2017 Filing 60 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #58 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #59 MOTION to Seal Document #58 Response in Opposition to Motion,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Ramey, William)
March 6, 2017 Filing 59 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Document #58 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Cerft. of service)(Ramey, William)
March 6, 2017 Filing 58 Supplemental RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer, #34 MOTION to Dismiss The Third Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer, #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER and D.N. 150 from 2:16-cv-908 filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order, #2 Exhibit Cert of service)(Ramey, William)
March 6, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION to Withdraw #43 MOTION to Alter Judgment Compel production and inspection by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
March 6, 2017 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Hearing by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
February 28, 2017 Filing 55 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #54 Response to Non-Motion,.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett N. Watkins, #2 Exhibit 5)(Mann, James)
February 28, 2017 Filing 54 ALIBABA DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO STRIKE GEMSA'S FINAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS ORIGINALLY FILED IN CASE 2:16-CV-00095 AS DKT. 239 by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc. to filed by Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mann, James)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to File to file Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/25/2017. (nkl, )
February 23, 2017 Filing 52 STIPULATION Regarding Evidence at Motion Hearing by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Watkins, Brett)
February 23, 2017 Filing 51 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Exhibit B) : #43 MOTION to Alter Judgment Compel production and inspection. (Ramey, William)
February 23, 2017 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion to Strike Final Infringement Contentions filed in 2:16-cv-00095 as D.N. 237 and 239 filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Decl. of WPRIII, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Decl. of WPRIII)(Ramey, William)
February 23, 2017 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to file Document Under Seal by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
February 23, 2017 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Final Infringement Contentions by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order on Leave, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Oder on MTS, #3 Affidavit Decl. of WPRIII, #4 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Decl. of WPRIII)(Ramey, William)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #42 Motion to amend Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/21/2017. (nkl, )
February 22, 2017 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #46 Sealed Document submitted by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. Incomplete document. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
February 21, 2017 Filing 46 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document. (Ramey, William) Modified on 2/22/2017 (sm, ).
February 21, 2017 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #44 Sealed Document submitted by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. Wrong event was used in filing and no certificate of authority to seal was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. PLEASE IGNORE #44. (sm, )
February 21, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 45, RESPONSE in Opposition. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 20, 2017 Filing 45 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Alter Judgment Compel production and inspection Response to Motion to Strike filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, Infringement contentions, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order for mleave, #4 Affidavit Ramey decl)(Ramey, William) Modified on 2/21/2017 (nkl, ).
February 20, 2017 Filing 44 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document. (Ramey, William) Modified on 2/21/2017 (sm, ).
February 20, 2017 Filing 43 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #63 MOTION to Compel production and inspection by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Decl of WPRIII, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to Decl of WPRIII, #4 Exhibit Ex. C to Decl of WPRIII)(Ramey, William) Modified on 2/22/2017 (sm, ). Modified on 3/7/2017 (nkl, ).
February 20, 2017 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION to amend Docket Control Order by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended DCO)(Ramey, William)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/13/2017. (nkl, )
February 13, 2017 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne Jury Selection set for 6/19/2017 09:00AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Motions in Limine due by 5/1/2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2017. (nkl, )
February 10, 2017 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed oder)(Ramey, William)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/2017. (nkl, )
February 8, 2017 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
February 8, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer, #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER, #34 MOTION to Dismiss The Third Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER withdrawing #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in light of Notice #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/7/2017. (rsp3, )
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DE-CONSOLIDATING CASE - that the below listed two cases currently consolidated under lead case Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. (GEMSA) v. Expedia, Inc., 2:16-cv-95 be no longer consolidated under lead case 2:16-cv-95: GEMSA v. eBay, Inc., 2:16-cv-98 GEMSA v. Alibaba.com, Inc. et al, 2:15-cv-1702. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/2017. (ch, )
August 24, 2016 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #34 MOTION to Dismiss The Third Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Ramey Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Ramey, William)
August 8, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss The Third Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer by Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Text of Proposed Order To Dismiss for Improper Venue, #3 Text of Proposed Order To Transfer Venue)(Mann, James)
July 25, 2016 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. for Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd.. (nkl, )
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer Replies due by 7/22/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/18/2016. (nkl, )
July 15, 2016 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss or Transfer by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
July 5, 2016 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20)(Ramey, William)
June 29, 2016 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #27 Motion for Leave and #28-#29 Sealed Documents submitted. Filed in the Consolidated case instead of Lead Case and other errors. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled in Lead Case. (sm, )
June 28, 2016 Filing 29 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document. (Ramey, William) Modified on 6/29/2016 (sm, ).
June 28, 2016 Filing 28 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document. (Ramey, William) Modified on 6/29/2016 (sm, ).
June 28, 2016 Filing 27 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Such to Add Alibaba.com Hong Kong, Ltd. as a Defendant by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2)(Ramey, William) Modified on 6/29/2016 (sm, ).
June 17, 2016 Filing 26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, To Transfer by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ho Lok Che, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss For Improper Venue, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer)(Mann, James)
June 13, 2016 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd. served on 4/21/2016, answer due 5/12/2016. (nkl, )
June 2, 2016 Filing 24 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ramey Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex A)(Ramey, William)
May 23, 2016 Filing 23 REPLY in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brett Watkins, #2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Brett Watkins, #3 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Brett Watkins, #4 Exhibit 3- Declaration of Brett Watkins)(Mann, James) Modified on 5/23/2016 (nkl, ).
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER Replies due by 5/23/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 05/23/2016. (nkl, )
May 23, 2016 ***Change the word response to reply per attorney.. Document # 23, REPLY in Support. *** (nkl, )
May 19, 2016 Filing 21 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Response to Motion,,, #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER by Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
May 4, 2016 ALL FUTURE FILINGS, EXCEPT VENUE, ARE TO BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE, FOR PRETRIAL ISSUES, PER CONSOLIDATION ORDER. (sm, )
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The Court previously entered a Consolidation Order consolidating multiple related cases with Lead Case No. 2:16-cv-95. (Dkt. No. 9). The Court now enters this additional Consolidation Order to consolidate additional cases with the Lead Case. The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) under Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. v. Expedia, Inc. et. al., (Civil Action No. 2:16-cv-0095-RWS-RSP) (the Lead Case). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/4/16. (ch, )
May 3, 2016 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Ramey Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex 1, #4 Exhibit Ex 2, #5 Exhibit Ex 3, #6 Exhibit Ex 4, #7 Exhibit Ex 5, #8 Exhibit Ex 6, #9 Exhibit Ex 7, #10 Exhibit Ex 8, #11 Exhibit Ex 9, #12 Exhibit Ex 10, #13 Exhibit Ex 11, #14 Exhibit Ex 12, #15 Exhibit Ex 13, #16 Exhibit Ex 14, #17 Exhibit Ex 15, #18 Exhibit Ex 16, #19 Exhibit Ex 17, #20 Exhibit Ex 18, #21 Exhibit Ex 19)(Ramey, William)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend the Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 04/28/2016. (nkl, )
April 27, 2016 Filing 17 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
April 13, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER by Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Lee, #2 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #3 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal for Improper Venue, #4 Text of Proposed Order for Transfer of Venue)(Mann, James)
March 31, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE by Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc. re #13 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, to Transfer : Notice of Withdrawal (Mann, James)
March 21, 2016 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Exhibit Ex 5, #7 Exhibit Ex 6, #8 Exhibit Ex 7, #9 Exhibit Ex 8, #10 Exhibit Ex 9, #11 Exhibit Ex 10, #12 Exhibit Ex 11, #13 Exhibit Ex 12, #14 Exhibit Ex 13, #15 Exhibit Ex 14, #16 Exhibit Ex 15, #17 Exhibit Ex 16, #18 Exhibit Ex 17, #19 Exhibit Ex 18)(Ramey, William)
March 3, 2016 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, to Transfer by Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Lee, #2 Declaration of Brett Watkins, #3 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Brett Watkins, #4 Text of Proposed Order to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #5 Text of Proposed Order to Dismiss for Improper Venue, #6 Text of Proposed Order to Transfer Venue)(Mann, James)
February 9, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR - this case is consolidated please file in the lead case. Document # 11 and 12, Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 8, 2016 Filing 12 FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd..( Ramey, William) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nkl, ).
February 8, 2016 Filing 11 FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd..( Ramey, William) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nkl, ).
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The cases above are CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial matters (except venue) with the Lead Case being 2:15-cv-01700-RWS-RSP. The parties shall docket all future filings (except for those relating to venue) in the Lead Case., Cases associated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/28/2016. (nkl, )
January 26, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd. served on 1/18/2016, answer due 2/8/2016. (nkl, )
January 21, 2016 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd..( Ramey, William)
January 21, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alibaba.com, Inc. to 2/17/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
January 11, 2016 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Alibaba.com, Inc. on 12/28/2015, answer due: 1/18/2016. (nkl, )
November 13, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. Certificate of Interested Persons (Ramey, William)
November 5, 2015 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
November 2, 2015 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent)(Ramey, William)
November 2, 2015 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd. c/o Corporation Service Company, Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd., Alibaba.com, Inc. c/o National Registered Agents, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) \Alibaba com Singapore E Commerce Private Ltd, #2 Summons(es) Alibaba Group Holding Ltd)(nkl, )
November 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/1/2015. (ch, )
November 1, 2015 Case assigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (ch, )
November 1, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 30, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5463529.), filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Alibaba Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. v. Alibaba.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba.com, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd.
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kash
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Gerchick
Represented By: Brett Watkins
Represented By: Carey R Ramos
Represented By: Nathan N Sun
Represented By: Nathan N. Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba.com Singapore E-Commerce Private Ltd.
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Brett Nelson Watkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Gerchick
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kash
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Gerchick
Represented By: Brett Watkins
Represented By: Carey R Ramos
Represented By: Nathan N Sun
Represented By: David Eiseman, IV
Represented By: Nathan N. Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba.com, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Brett Nelson Watkins
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Gerchick
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kash
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Gerchick
Represented By: Brett Watkins
Represented By: Carey R Ramos
Represented By: Nathan N Sun
Represented By: David Eiseman, IV
Represented By: Nathan N. Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay Inc.
Represented By: Audrey Hsio-Chun Lo
Represented By: Bryan J. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alibaba.com Hong Kong Ltd.
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Brett Nelson Watkins
Represented By: Jennifer A. Kash
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Gerchick
Represented By: Brett Watkins
Represented By: Carey R Ramos
Represented By: Nathan N Sun
Represented By: David Eiseman, IV
Represented By: Nathan N. Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.
Represented By: William Peterson Ramey, III
Represented By: William E. Thomson, Jr.
Represented By: David Allen Randall
Represented By: John Bryant Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
Represented By: William Peterson Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: William E Thomson, Jr.
Represented By: James Anthony Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David A Randall
Represented By: James Anthony Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?