Sun Group U.S.A. Harmony City, Inc. v. CRRC Corporation LTD et al
Plaintiff: Sun Group U.S.A. Harmony City, Inc.
Defendant: CRRC Corporation LTD, CRRC MA Corporation, China Railway International U.S.A. Company, LTD and CRRC Sifang America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02191
Filed: April 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 218 Administrative Motion for Letter of Rogatory.(sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2022)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER Regarding Hague Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on January 4, 2022. (sklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION OF HAGUE CONVENTION (Granting 132 Motion to Provide Additional Evidence, Granting 133 Request to Provide Additional Evidence, Granting 144 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief). Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on November 19, 2019. (sklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019) Modified on 11/19/2019 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Group U.S.A. Harmony City, Inc. v. CRRC Corporation LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Group U.S.A. Harmony City, Inc.
Represented By: John Paul Balazs
Represented By: Gregory Stuart Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRRC Corporation LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRRC MA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Railway International U.S.A. Company, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRRC Sifang America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?