Webcor Construction, LP et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Webcor Construction, LP and Architectural Glass and Aluminum Co., Inc.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, Old Republic General Insurance Corporation, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA., Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc. and Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv02220
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING MOTORISTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING OLD REPUBLIC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; denying 211 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 212 Motion for Summary Judgment. Within five business days of this Order, Motorists shall submit a proposed form of judgment, approved as to form by Old Republic, which will be entered forthwith. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN COMPLAINTS, CROSS CLAIMS AND COUNTER CLAIMS PURSUANT TO PARTIAL SETTLEMENT OF ACTION AND VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING SET FOR APRIL 27, 2018; re 206 Stipulation, filed by Zurich Ame rican Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA., Old Republic General Insurance Corporation, Webcor Construction, LP, Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc., Architectural Glass and Aluminum Co., Inc.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/24/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/26/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING REVISED STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR LIU, ZURICH AND OLD REPLUBLIC TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO 11/15/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/27/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 AMENDED ORDER re 163 Order [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] Granting 162 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Response filed by 11/9/17. Any Motion to Dismiss shall be set for hearing on or after ** DECEMBER 19, 2017**, to be heard with any other pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/25/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 52 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend; ; denying as moot 122 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 125 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 144 Administrative Motion ; Vacating Case Management Conference. Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING re 25 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/15/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webcor Construction, LP et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Webcor Construction, LP
Represented By: Amy B. Briggs
Represented By: Susan White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Architectural Glass and Aluminum Co., Inc.
Represented By: Amy B. Briggs
Represented By: David Francis Myers
Represented By: Brandt Louis Wolkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Blaise S. Curet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic General Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Underwriters Inc.
Represented By: Susan Jacqueline Field
Represented By: Chad A. Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?