Jonathan Anthony Lewis Trust et al v. Flagstar Bank FSB et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Anthony Lewis Trust and Karen Irene Lewis Trust
Defendant: Flagstar Bank FSB, J P Morgan Chase Bank NA, Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLC, Crowd Fund Investment Group LLC, Edward Alan Treder and Joan H. Anderson
Case Number: 3:2017cv02239
Filed: April 21, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ALL DEFENDANTS AND THE ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE. ***Deadlines terminated. Motions terminated: 42 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Roland P. Reynolds filed by Flagstar Bank FSB, 25 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Flagstar Bank FSB, 40 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by J P Morgan Chase Bank NA. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/23/2017 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
September 19, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT FLAGSTAR BANK FSB'S REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/19/2017. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
August 23, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT EDWARD ALAN TREDER WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Edward Alan Treder terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 4, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT JOAN H. ANDERSON WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/04/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
August 2, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION. The case shall be stayed until September 29, 2017. The hearing on Flagstar's motion to dismiss is continued from August 18, 2017, to November 17, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file their opposit ion to Flagstar's motion no later than October 13, 2017, and Flagstar shall file its reply no later than October 20, 2017. All remaining defendants who have been served and have yet to respond shall answer or move to dismiss on September 29, 201 7. Any motion to dismiss filed prior to September 29, 2017 shall be deemed filed on September 29, 2017 for purposes of calculating opposition and reply briefing under the Court's Civil Local Rules, and noticed for hearing on November 17, 2017. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 18, 2017, to January 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 08/02/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 14, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT FLAGSTAR BANK FSB TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/14/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 5, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonathan Anthony Lewis Trust et al v. Flagstar Bank FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Anthony Lewis Trust
Represented By: Charles Henry Hack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Irene Lewis Trust
Represented By: Charles Henry Hack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagstar Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J P Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowd Fund Investment Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Alan Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan H. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?