Harry v. KCG Americas LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bright Harry
Defendant: KCG Americas LLC, Daniel B. Coleman, Carl Gilmore, Greg Hostetler, Main Street Trading, Inc., Patrick J. Flynn, Edward W. Wedbush, ION Trading, Inc., Andrea Pignataro, Robert Sylverne, Computer Voice Systems, Inc., Paul Sturm and Scott William Benz
Case Number: 3:2017cv02385
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 7:6
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 126 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/19/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 124 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Sanctions.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. STRIKING IMPERMISSIBLE FILINGS; DENYING 102 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE; DENYING 103 MOTION TO STAY; DENYING 76 MOTION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW; GRANTING ( 86 , 89 and 90 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 120 Motion to Appear by Telephone of Attorney Edward Corcoran. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 94 Administrative Motion to Relate Case to 18-cv-02524-EMC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 76 MOTION. Responses due by 4/27/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 79 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER TO ISSUE SUMMONS.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ([38, 40 and 43 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018) Modified on 3/7/2018 to correct typo (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christie, Robert. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harry v. KCG Americas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bright Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCG Americas LLC
Represented By: Katharine Lane Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel B. Coleman
Represented By: Katharine Lane Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Gilmore
Represented By: Katharine Lane Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Hostetler
Represented By: Katharine Lane Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Trading, Inc.
Represented By: Katharine Lane Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Flynn
Represented By: Katharine Lane Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward W. Wedbush
Represented By: Katharine Lane Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ION Trading, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Pignataro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sylverne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computer Voice Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott William Benz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?