Schieberl v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Tim Schieberl
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2017cv02433
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS UPON CONSENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/22/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
May 15, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is ordered to make partial payment of the filing fee in the amount of $150.00 no later than June 2, 2017. Failure to pay this amount will result in dismissal of the action without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby apprised of his responsibility to serve defendant with the complaint and any amendments, and the Procedural Order for Social Security Review Actions, pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has a continuing obligation to keep the Court informed of his current address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 4, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/04/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schieberl v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Schieberl
Represented By: Stuart Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?