Craig Ogans v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Craig Ogans
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv02443
Filed: April 28, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court having been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this cause, it is ordered that, in lieu of the order to show cause requested by plaintiff, the claims alleged against defendant herein be dismiss ed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within forty-five days, with proof of service of a copy thereof on the opposing party, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been deliv ered, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/18/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
June 27, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendant shall file and serve its response to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint no later than July 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/27/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 7, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/07/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 1, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Defendant shall file and serve its response to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint no later than June 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/01/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 31, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/31/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 23, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig Ogans v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Ogans
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Alexandra Brown
Represented By: Cara Yewleh Chee
Represented By: E. Jeffrey Grube, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?