Cooks v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Linda Cooks
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 3:2017cv02539
Filed: May 3, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 10, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. The July 14, 2017 hearing on plaintiff's motion is vacated. Defendant's request to appear telephonically is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 07/10/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
June 19, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFORDING WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. OPPORTUNITY TO FILE SURREPLY; CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND; VACATING HEARING ON WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. may file, no la ter than June 29, 2017, a surreply, not to exceed ten pages in length, addressing plaintiff's new allegations and arguments based thereon. The hearing on plaintiff's motion to remand, currently set for June 23, 2017, is continued to July 14, 2017. The July 21, 2017 hearing on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s motion to dismiss plaintiff's first amended complaint is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 06/19/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
May 31, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/31/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 16, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/16/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooks v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cooks
Represented By: Joy Johnson
Represented By: Joy Johnson
Represented By: Ayo Omotosho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel A Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?