Frenken v. Hunter

Plaintiff: Geerte M. Frenken
Defendant: David J. Hunter
Case Number: 3:2017cv02667
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT granting 70 MOTION to Dismiss 69 Third Amended Complaint of Geerte M. Frenken. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam on 12/24/18. ***Civil Case Terminated. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 77 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing on August 23, 2018 at 2PM.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 72 Administrative Motion FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 48 , 49 , 51 )MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 64 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Ms. Frenken shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 46 Administrative Motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's second amended complaint. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation to Extend Time of Response of Defendant Amy Hunter to Second Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED 7 ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/14/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frenken v. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geerte M. Frenken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?