Franklin v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Franklin
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv02702
Filed: May 10, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR AMENDING THEPLEADINGS re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Gregory Franklin. Amended Pleadings due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
October 31, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING MOTION TO STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 19 Motion to Stay Proceedings; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
July 20, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 19 MOTION to Dismiss pending ruling by the United States Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit filed by Gregory Franklin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 20, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Franklin
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Veronica Elizabeth McKnight
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Chad R Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?