Zayas v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Estrella Lysandra Zayas
Defendant: State of California, California Highway Patrol, Joseph A. Farrow, Jose Ortega and Timothy J. Brown
Case Number: 3:2017cv02739
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Joseph A. Farrow, State of California, Jose Ortega, Timothy J. Brown, California Highway Patrol. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/14/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by State of California and Plaintiff filed by State of California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/14/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 7, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 7 filed by California Highway Patrol. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/7/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zayas v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estrella Lysandra Zayas
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Represented By: Kymberly Elizabeth Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?